Founded in 1891, Electricity Canada (formerly the Canadian Electricity Association) is the national forum and voice of the evolving and innovative electricity business in Canada. The Association supports, through its advocacy efforts, the regional, national, and international success of its members. Electricity Canada members generate, transmit, and distribute electrical energy to industrial, commercial, residential, and institutional customers across Canada. Members include integrated electric utilities, independent power producers, transmission and distribution companies, power marketers, manufacturers and suppliers of materials, technology, and services and represent over 85% of the Canadian population. Electricity Canada is the national voice for sustainable electricity for its members and the customers they serve as the country works towards a Net Zero by 2050 future.
Francis Bradley, President and CEO
Adresse :
275 Slater Street
Suite 1500
Ottawa, ON K1P 5H9
Canada
Numéro de téléphone :
613-230-9263
Ceci est le nom de l'agent responsable tel qu'indiqué dans l'enregistrement le plus récent de l'entreprise ou de l'organisation.
Nom | De | à |
---|---|---|
ELECTRICITY CANADA/ÉLECTRICITÉ CANADA | 2024-04-30 | actuel |
ELECTRICITY CANADA/ÉLECTRICITÉ CANADA | 2022-03-01 | 2024-04-30 |
CANADIAN ELECTRICITY ASSOCIATION/ASSOCIATION CANADIENNE DE L'ELECTRICITE | 2008-08-12 | 2022-03-01 |
Nom de l'agent responsable | De (aaaa-mm-jj) | À (aaaa-mm-jj) |
---|---|---|
Francis Bradley | 2018-12-14 | Actuel |
Sergio Marchi | 2015-02-09 | 2018-12-14 |
Jim Burpee | 2012-02-02 | 2015-02-09 |
Pierre Guimond | 2008-05-30 | 2012-02-02 |
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Constituency Assistant
House of Commons, Constituency Office of Hon. Patricia (Paddy) Torsney, MP |
novembre 2005 à mars 2006 | Pas une charge désignée |
Constituency Assistant
House of Commons, Constituency Office of Hon. Patricia (Paddy) Torsney, MP |
mai 2005 à juin 2005 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Senior Science Specialist
Environment Canada, River Road Labs |
2013 à 2014 | Pas une charge désignée |
Senior Project Officer
Environment Canada, Science and Technology Branch |
2010 à 2013 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Junior Analyst
Canadian Coast Guard, Arctic Strategies and Engagement |
mai 2019 à août 2019 | Pas une charge désignée |
Operations Officer
Global Affairs Canada, Emergency Watch and Response Center |
septembre 2018 à décembre 2019 | Pas une charge désignée |
Negotiation Intern
Indigenous and Northern Affairs Canada, Specific Claims Branch |
janvier 2018 à avril 2018 | Pas une charge désignée |
Co-op/FSWEP Student
Statistics Canada, Health Division |
mai 2017 à décembre 2017 | Pas une charge désignée |
Enumerator
Statistics Canada, Census Program |
2016 à 2016 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant
House of Commons, Member of Parliament |
mai 2018 à août 2018 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Legislative Advisor
Hose of Commons, MP Stephen Woodworth’s Office |
mai 2013 à octobre 2015 | Pas une charge désignée |
Communications Officer
Environment Canada, Communications, National Capital Region |
octobre 2009 à octobre 2010 | Pas une charge désignée |
Intern
Minister of the Environment’s Office, Minister of the Environment’s Office |
avril 2009 à septembre 2009 | Pas une charge désignée |
Intern
Prime Minister’s Office, Prime Minister’s Office |
septembre 2008 à décembre 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Policy Analyst
Department of Industry Canada, Environmental Affairs Branch |
août 1999 à juin 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Program Manager
Natural Resources Canada, Office of Energy Efficiency |
janvier 2010 à septembre 2013 | Pas une charge désignée |
Strategic Planning Advisor
Transport Canada, Communications and Marketing |
mai 2009 à septembre 2009 | Pas une charge désignée |
Policy Analyst
Transport Canada, Innovation Directorate |
avril 2008 à avril 2009 | Pas une charge désignée |
Technology Officer, Investments
Natural Resources Canada, Office of Energy Research and Development |
mai 2007 à avril 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
Program Officer
Transport Canada, Security Task Force |
octobre 2006 à mai 2007 | Pas une charge désignée |
Project Officer
Environment Canada, International Affairs Branch |
novembre 2005 à avril 2006 | Pas une charge désignée |
Project Officer
Environment Canada, Environmental Technology Advancement Directorate |
octobre 2001 à janvier 2004 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Corporal (Reservist)
Canadian Armed Forces, Governor Generals Footguards |
1990 à 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |