Queen's University is one of Canada'a leading universities, with an international reputation for scholarship, research, social purpose, spirit and diversity
Daniel Woolf, Principal and Vice-Chancellor
End date of the last completed financial year: 2010-04-30
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Canada Research Chairs | $8,575,000.00 | Yes |
Canadian Foundation for Innovation | $10,604,000.00 | Yes |
Canadian Institutes of Health Research | $16,612,000.00 | Yes |
Federal Government | $25,173,000.00 | Yes |
Foreign Governments | $0.00 | Yes |
Health Canada | $100,000.00 | Yes |
Kingston Municipal Government | $5,000.00 | Yes |
Natural Sciences and Engineering Research Council | $37,345,000.00 | Yes |
Ontario Provincial Government | $230,128,000.00 | Yes |
Other Provinces | $0.00 | Yes |
Social Sciences and Humanities Research Council | $8,223,000.00 | Yes |
Address:
Richardson Hall, 74 University Ave.,
Kingston, ON K7L 3N6
Canada
Telephone number:
613-533-2201
Fax number:
613-533-6838
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Queen's University | 2024-04-01 | current |
Queen's University | 2008-08-15 | 2024-04-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Patrick Deane | 2019-07-01 | Current |
Daniel Woolf | 2009-09-01 | 2019-07-01 |
Thomas Williams | 2008-05-30 | 2009-09-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Naval Officer
Department of National Defence, Canadian Navy |
July 1994 to July 1998 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Canadian Defence Liaison Staff and Defence Attaché
Department of National Defence/Department of Foreign Affairs, Canadian High Commission, London |
2000 to 2003 | Not a designated office |
Chief of Staff
Department of National Defence, Defence Information Services Organization |
1997 to 2000 | Not a designated office |
Chief of Staff
Department of National Defence, Deputy Chief of Defence Staff |
1996 to 1997 | Not a designated office |
Base Commander
Department of National Defence, CFB Kingston |
1993 to 1996 | Not a designated office |
Student
Department of National Defence, National Defence College |
1992 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Commandant
Department of National Defence, Canadian Forces School of Communications and Electronics |
1990 to 1992 | Not a designated office |
Military Officer
Department of National Defence, Canadian Forces |
May 1964 to October 2003 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Research Officer
Atomic Energy Canada, Chalk River, Ontario |
August 1980 to August 1982 | Not a designated office |
Associate Research Officer
Atomic Energy of Canada, Chalk River, Ontario |
August 1975 to August 1980 | Not a designated office |
Assistant Research Officer
Atomic Energy Canada, Chalk River, Ontario |
August 1970 to August 1975 | Not a designated office |
Postdoctoral Fellow
Atomic Energy Canada, Chalk River, Ontario |
August 1969 to August 1970 | Not a designated office |