Queen's University is one of Canada'a leading universities, with an international reputation for scholarship, research, social purpose, spirit and diversity
Patrick Deane, Principal and Vice-Chancellor
End date of the last completed financial year: 2021-04-30
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Canada Foundation for Innovation | $15,134,000.00 | Yes |
Canada Research Chairs | $8,985,000.00 | Yes |
Canadian Institutes of Health Research (CIHR) | $15,120,000.00 | Yes |
Foreign | $5,672,000.00 | Yes |
Government of Ontario | $245,007,000.00 | Yes |
Municipal | $78,000.00 | Yes |
Natural Sciences and Engineering Research Council (NSERC) | $26,580,000.00 | Yes |
Other federal | $34,902,000.00 | Yes |
Other provinces | $560,000.00 | Yes |
Social Sciences and Humanities Research Council (SSHRC) | $16,124,000.00 | Yes |
Address:
Richardson Hall, 74 University Ave.,
Kingston, ON K7L 3N6
Canada
Telephone number:
613-533-3126
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Queen's University | 2024-04-01 | current |
Queen's University | 2008-08-15 | 2024-04-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Patrick Deane | 2019-07-01 | Current |
Daniel Woolf | 2009-09-01 | 2019-07-01 |
Thomas Williams | 2008-05-30 | 2009-09-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Research Officer
Atomic Energy Canada, Chalk River, Ontario |
August 1980 to August 1982 | Not a designated office |
Associate Research Officer
Atomic Energy of Canada, Chalk River, Ontario |
August 1975 to August 1980 | Not a designated office |
Assistant Research Officer
Atomic Energy Canada, Chalk River, Ontario |
August 1970 to August 1975 | Not a designated office |
Postdoctoral Fellow
Atomic Energy Canada, Chalk River, Ontario |
August 1969 to August 1970 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Analyst
Human Resources Development Canada, Social Policy, Strategic Policy |
January 2001 to August 2003 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Social Science Researcher
Statistics Canada, Health Analysis and Measurement Group |
1998 to 2001 | Not a designated office |
Economist/Sociologist/Statistician Recruit
Statistics Canada, Health Statistics Division |
1997 to 1998 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief of Staff
Human Resources and Skills Development Canada, Minister's Office |
July 2008 to September 2011 | September 30, 2011 |
Director of Communications
Citizenship & Immigration, Minister's Office |
October 2006 to July 2008 | July 31, 2008 |