CGA's business activities over the 2007 to 2009 planning horizon are organized around four goals and supportive strategies. The goals are expressive of both the fundamental principles that guide CGA and of ultimate outcomes that we strive towards.· Public policy to support efficient energy markets and the role of natural gas.· Supportive fiscal and economic regulatory conditions.· A practical approach to sustainability in the evolution of energy systems.· Excellence in safe and reliable operations.
MICHAEL CLELAND, PRESIDENT AND CHIEF EXECUTIVE OFFICER
End date of the last completed financial year: 2008-12-29
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Natural Resources Canada (NRCan) | $15,000.00 | Yes |
Transport Canada (TC) | $5,250.00 | Yes |
Address:
809 - 350 SPARKS STREET
OTTAWA, ON K1R 7S8
Canada
Telephone number:
613-748-0057
Fax number:
613-748-9078
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Canadian Gas Association/Association canadienne du gaz | 2024-05-09 | current |
Canadian Gas Association/Association canadienne du gaz | 2008-08-08 | 2024-05-09 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
TIMOTHY EGAN | 2010-09-01 | Current |
MICHAEL CLELAND | 2003-04-14 | 2010-09-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director
Natural Resources Canada, Housing, Buildings and Regulations Division |
March 1997 to April 2007 | Not a designated office |
Director
Natural Resources Canada, Management Services Division |
September 1995 to February 1997 | Not a designated office |
Director
Natural Resources Canada, Corporate Services Division |
December 1994 to August 1995 | Not a designated office |
Director
Natural Resources Canada, Administrative Informatics Services |
December 1992 to December 1994 | Not a designated office |
Director
Natural Resources Canada, Assets Management and Administrative Services |
July 1989 to December 1992 | Not a designated office |
Chief
Natural Resources Canada, Technology Transfer and Analysis |
December 1988 to June 1989 | Not a designated office |
Coordinator
Natural Resources Canada, Solar Energy Division |
September 1986 to November 1988 | Not a designated office |
Coordinator
Natural Resources Canada, Renewable Energy Division |
April 1985 to September 1986 | Not a designated office |
Solar Program Analyst
Natural Resources Canada, Renewable Energy Division |
April 1984 to March 1985 | Not a designated office |
Energy Policy Analyst
Natural Resources Canada, Renewable Energy Division |
July 1981 to March 1984 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Economist
Natural Resources Canada, Natural Gas Division |
July 2003 to January 2009 | Not a designated office |
Program Officer
Department of Fisheries and Oceans, Aboriginal Policy and Governance |
May 2002 to July 2003 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Assistant Deputy Minister
Natural Resources Canada, Energy Sector |
1997 to March 2000 | Not a designated office |
Assistant Director
Department of Finance, Energy and Resources Policy Division |
July 1987 to January 1990 | Not a designated office |
Director General
Natural Resources Canada, Energy Policy Division |
January 1987 to 1996 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Environmental Analyst
Environment Canada, Water Planning & Management Branch |
1975 to 1980 | Not a designated office |