THE INSURANCE BROKERS ASSOCIATION OF CANADA (IBAC) IS THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE BROKERS IN CANADA. IN SUPPORT OF OUR PRIMARY MANDATE OF GOVERNMENT RELATIONS, WE ALSO DEVELOP NATIONAL LICENSING COURSES AND PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT PROGRAMS FOR BROKERS, FOR DELIVERY THROUGH OUR MEMBER ASSOCIATIONS.
Peter Braid, CHIEF EXECUTIVE OFFICER
Address:
1210-18 KING STREET EAST
TORONTO, ON M5C 1C4
Canada
Telephone number:
416-367-1831
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Insurance Brokers Association of Canada/Association des courtiers d'assurances du Canada | 2024-05-01 | current |
Insurance Brokers Association of Canada/Association des courtiers d'assurances du Canada | 2019-01-02 | 2024-05-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Peter Braid | 2019-01-02 | Current |
DAN DANYLUK | 2003-05-22 | 2006-03-20 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
EXECUTIVE ASSISTANT
HOUSE OF COMMONS, MEMBER OF PARLIAMENT OFFICE |
September 2006 to October 2015 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
EXECUTIVE ASSISTANT
HOUSE OF COMMONS, MEMBER OF PARLIAMENT OFFICE |
September 2006 to October 2015 | Not a designated office |