A world-leading manufacturer of innovative business jets. Bombardier Inc. is a global corporation headquartered in Canada.
Éric Martel, President and Chief Executive Officer
Address:
400 Boulevard Côte-Vertu Ouest
Dorval, QC H4S 1Y9
Canada
Telephone number:
514-861-9481
Bombardier Inc. is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
Bombardier Inc. does not have any subsidiaries that could have a direct interest in the outcome of the undertaking
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Bombardier Inc. | 2024-05-15 | current |
Bombardier Inc. | 2008-07-01 | 2024-05-15 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Éric Martel | 2020-04-06 | Current |
Alain Bellemare | 2015-02-13 | 2020-04-06 |
Pierre Beaudoin | 2008-07-01 | 2015-02-13 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief of Staff
Health Canada, Office of the Minister of Health |
April 2012 to December 2012 | December 31, 2012 |
Chief of Staff
Ministry of Intergovernmental Affairs, Office of the Minister of Intergovernmental Affairs |
May 2011 to April 2012 | April 30, 2012 |
Chief of Staff
Ministry of International Trade, Office of the Minister of International Trade |
January 2010 to May 2011 | May 31, 2011 |
Chief of Staff
Public Safety Canada, Office of the Minister of Public Safety |
September 2009 to January 2010 | January 29, 2010 |
Director of Communications
Prime Minister's Office, Prime Minister's Office |
February 2006 to June 2008 | Not a designated office |