CONOCOPHILLIPS CANADA (BRC) Ltd EXPLORES FOR, PRODUCES, REFINES, MARKETS, SUPPLIES AND TRANSPORTS PETROLEUM PRODUCTS IN ADDITION TO NATURAL GAS GATHERING, PROCESSING AND MARKETING. CONOCOPHILLIPS CANADA HAS RESOURCES IN NORTHERN, ATLANTIC AND WESTERN CANADA INCLUDING OIL SANDS IN ALBERTA.
Ken Lueers, President
Address:
1600, 401 - 9th Avenue SW
Calgary, AB T2P 2H7
Canada
Telephone number:
403-260-2021
Fax number:
403-260-2175
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
ConocoPhillips Canada Resources Corp. | 2024-03-31 | current |
ConocoPhillips Canada Resources Corp. | 2015-11-10 | 2024-03-31 |
ConocoPhillips Canada (BRC) Ltd. | 2009-03-01 | 2015-11-10 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Bijan Agarwal | 2021-06-14 | Current |
Kirk Johnson | 2018-06-01 | 2021-06-14 |
Michael Hatfield | 2016-11-01 | 2018-06-01 |
Ken Lueers | 2012-06-01 | 2016-11-01 |
Joe Marushack | 2010-06-01 | 2012-06-01 |
Matt Fox | 2009-07-15 | 2010-06-01 |
Kevin Meyers | 2009-03-01 | 2009-07-15 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Policy Advisor
Foriegn Affairs, Minister's Office |
December 2000 to February 2002 | Not a designated office |
Senior Policy Advisor
Industry, Minister's Office |
October 1998 to December 2000 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Justice, Minister's Office |
June 1997 to October 1998 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Natural Resources, Minister's Office |
November 1996 to June 1997 | Not a designated office |