Total Number of Communication Reports: 94
Monthly communication reports in the last 6 months: 0
Food Banks Canada is a national charitable organization representing the food bank community across Canada. In 2016, Food Banks Canada acquired and shared more than 20 million pounds of donated food through its National Food Sharing System. The organization also conducts research, engages in public education and advocates for public policy change to address the root causes of hunger in Canada.
Chris Hatch, Chief Executive Officer
End date of the last completed financial year: 2018-03-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Canadian Heritage (PCH) | $5,000.00 | Yes |
Address:
5090 Explorer Drive, Suite 203
Mississauga, ON L4W 4T9
Canada
Telephone number:
905-602-5234
Ext.
222
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Food Banks Canada/Banques alimentaires Canada | 2024-04-18 | current |
Food Banks Canada/Banques alimentaires Canada | 2009-06-02 | 2024-04-18 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Kirstin Beardsley | 2022-02-01 | Current |
Chris Hatch | 2018-03-01 | 2021-11-16 |
Miriam Lowi-Young | 2017-09-04 | 2018-03-01 |
Katharine Schmidt | 2009-06-02 | 2017-09-04 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Advisor
House of Commons, The Hon. Bob Rae, MP |
September 2009 to May 2010 | Not a designated office |
Senior Policy Advisor
Senate of Canada, Office of the Leader of the Opposition in the Senate |
November 2008 to September 2009 | September 8, 2009 |