The Canadian Medical Association (CMA) is a national, voluntary association of physicians that advocates on behalf of its members and the public for access to high-quality health care. The CMA also provides leadership and guidance to physicians. The CMA was formed in Quebec City in 1867, just three months after the birth of Canada. It was created by 164 physicians who recognized the need for a national medical body. They selected Sir Charles Tupper, who would later serve as Canada's prime minister, as the first president. Today the CMA has more than 85,000 members, and advocates on behalf of both members and their patients — on Parliament Hill, during federal election campaigns and in the media. The CMA also takes the lead on public health issues. CMA’s Mission: Helping physicians care for patients. CMA’s Vision: The CMA will be the leader in engaging and serving physicians, and the national voice for the highest standards for health and health care.
Timothy Smith, Chief Executive Officer
End date of the last completed financial year: 2016-12-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Health Canada (HC) | $0.00 | Yes |
Address:
1867 Alta Vista Drive
Ottawa, ON K1G 5W8
Canada
Telephone number:
613-731-8610
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Canadian Medical Association/Association médicale canadienne | 2024-03-01 | current |
Canadian Medical Association/Association médicale canadienne | 2008-10-07 | 2024-03-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Timothy Smith | 2013-12-08 | Current |
Paul-Émile Cloutier | 2009-07-20 | 2013-12-08 |
Barbara Drew | 2008-10-07 | 2009-07-20 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Program Officer
Health Canada, Division of Aging and Senior |
October 1996 to May 1998 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Research Analyst, Senior Research Analyst
Statistics Canada, Health Division |
September 1978 to October 1990 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Secretary
National Capital Commission, Surveys and Mapping |
December 1989 to August 1992 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Analyst
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, U.S. Bureau |
May 1994 Footnote 3 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant to the Secretary of State
Industry Canada, Office of the Secretary of State for Science, Research & Development |
August 1995 to November 1995 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Consultant, Medical Ethics
Canadian Armed Forces, Not applicable |
July 2003 to August 2003 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Acting Chief, National Hospital Productivity & Promotion Branch
Health & Welfare Canada, Health Services & Promotion Branch |
December 1983 to March 1990 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Advisor
The Senate of Canada, The Honourable Aurélien Gill, Senator |
March 2009 to May 2009 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor
The Senate of Canada, The Honourable Charlie Watt, Senator |
February 2007 to February 2009 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor
The Senate of Canada, The Honourable Jean Lapointe, Senator |
September 2001 to May 2010 | Not a designated office |
Senior Advisor
Heritage Canada, Office of the Secretary of State (Multicultarism) Status of Women |
February 2000 to September 2001 | Not a designated office |
Senior Advisor
The Senate of Canada, The Honourable Pierre De Bané, Senator |
May 1999 to January 2000 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Parliamentary Assistant
House of Commons, Member of Parliament |
May 2010 to August 2014 | Not a designated office |
Senior Advisor
Liberal Party of Canada, Office of the Leader of the Official Opposition |
January 2009 to May 2010 | May 31, 2010 |
Chief of Staff
Citizenship and Immigration, Minister of Citizenship and Immigration |
February 2002 to August 2004 | Not a designated office |
Chief of Staff
Canadian Heritage, Minister of Canadian Heritage |
May 1998 to August 2001 | Not a designated office |
Senior Policy Advisor
Heritage Canada, Office of the Minister of Canadian Heritage |
July 1997 to May 1998 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
National Defense, Office of the Minister of National Defense |
October 1996 to June 1997 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Human Resources Development, Office of the Minister of Human Resources Development |
January 1996 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Ministry of Transportation, Office of the Minister of Transport |
November 1993 to January 1996 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Executive Assistant & Office Manager
House of Commons, Office of Joe Jordan, Member of Parliament (Leeds-Grenville) |
June 1997 to January 2000 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Ian Murray, Member of Parliament |
September 1994 to June 1997 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Jim Jordan, Member of Parliament |
December 1988 to December 1993 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Terry Clifford, Member of Parliament |
December 1987 to December 1988 | Not a designated office |
Members Assistant
House of Commons, Bud Bradley, Member of Parliament |
February 1985 to December 1987 | Not a designated office |