THE CANADIAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION (CMA) IS THE NATIONAL VOICE OF CANADIAN PHYSICIANS. FOUNDED IN 1867, CMA'S MISSION IS TO SERVE AND UNITE THE PHYSICIANS OF CANADA AND BE THE NATIONAL ADVOCATE, IN PARTNERSHIP WITH THE PEOPLE OF CANADA FOR THE HIGHEST STANDARDS OF HEALTH AND HEALTH CARE. ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS AND THE CANADIAN PUBLIC, CMA PERFORMS A WIDE VARIETY OF FUNCTIONS, SUCH AS ADVOCATING HEALTH PROMOTION AND DISEASE/INJURY PREVENTION POLICIES AND STRATEGIES, ADVOCATING FOR ACCESS TO QUALITY HEALTH CARE, FACILITATING CHANGE WITHIN THE MEDICAL PROFESSION, AND PROVIDING LEADERSHIP AND GUIDANCE TO PHYSICIANS TO HELP THEM INFLUENCE, MANAGE AND ADAPT TO CHANGES IN HEALTH CARE DELIVERY.
Paul-Émile Cloutier, Secretary General and Chief Executive Officer
Date de la fin du dernier exercice financier complet : 2008-12-31
Institution gouvernementale | Financement reçu au cours du dernier exercice financier | Financement attendu pendant l'exercice financier en cours |
---|---|---|
Environnement Canada | 136 790,00 $ | Oui |
Patrimoine canadien (PCH) | 148 394,00 $ | Oui |
Santé Canada (SC) | 252 369,25 $ | Oui |
Adresse :
1867 Alta Vista Drive
Ottawa, ON K1G 5W8
Canada
Numéro de téléphone :
613-731-8610
Poste
1241
Numéro de fax :
613-731-1755
Ceci est le nom de l'agent responsable tel qu'indiqué dans l'enregistrement le plus récent de l'entreprise ou de l'organisation.
Nom | De | à |
---|---|---|
Canadian Medical Association/Association médicale canadienne | 2024-03-01 | actuel |
Canadian Medical Association/Association médicale canadienne | 2008-10-07 | 2024-03-01 |
Nom de l'agent responsable | De (aaaa-mm-jj) | À (aaaa-mm-jj) |
---|---|---|
Timothy Smith | 2013-12-08 | Actuel |
Paul-Émile Cloutier | 2009-07-20 | 2013-12-08 |
Barbara Drew | 2008-10-07 | 2009-07-20 |
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Senior Policy Advisor
International Affairs, Department of Indian Affairs and Northern Development |
1992 à 1995 | Pas une charge désignée |
Chief of Staff and Senior Advisor
Minister's Office, External Relations and International Development |
1986 à 1992 | Pas une charge désignée |
Executive and Legislation Assistant to the Minister of Immigration, Walter Maclean and Flora MacDonald
Minister's Office, Department of Immigration |
1985 à 1986 | Pas une charge désignée |
Senior Advisor, Industrial Relations
Canada Ports Corporation, Industrial Relations |
1980 à 1985 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Director of Communications
Industry Canada, Office of the Minister of State (Fed Economic Initiative for Northern Ontario) |
décembre 2004 à février 2006 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Canalman
Parks Canada, Rideau Canal |
1986 à 1990 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Senior Program Officer
Health Canada, Division of Aging and Senior |
octobre 1996 à mai 1998 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Senior Policy Advisor
International Affairs, Department of Indian Affairs and Northern Development |
1992 à 1995 | Pas une charge désignée |
Chief of Staff and Senior Advisor
Minister's Office, External Relations and International Development |
1986 à 1992 | Pas une charge désignée |
Executive and Legislation Assistant to the Minister of Immigration, Walter Maclean and Flora MacDonald
Minister's Office, Department of Immigration |
1985 à 1986 | Pas une charge désignée |
Senior Advisor, Industrial Relations
Canada Ports Corporation, Industrial Relations |
1980 à 1985 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
House Leader's Assistant
House of Commons, Federal NDP Caucus |
1993 à 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Senior Research Officer (Social Policy)
House of Commons, Federal NDP Caucus Research Office |
1991 à 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Legislative Assistant (Health and Social Policy)
House of Commons, Office of Maple Ridge-Pitt Meadow MP |
1988 à 1991 | Pas une charge désignée |
Legislative Assistant (Fisheries Policy)
House of Commons, Office of Cowichan-Malahat MP |
1986 à 1988 | Pas une charge désignée |
Legislative Assistant (Fisheries Policy)
House of Commons, Office of Comox-Powell River MP |
1984 à 1986 | Pas une charge désignée |
Assistant
House of Commons, Windsor Essex MP |
1984 à 1984 | Pas une charge désignée |
Research Assistant (CPP/OAS and Veterans Affairs Policy)
House of Commons, Office of Winnipeg North Centre MP |
1983 à 1984 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Executive Assistant & Office Manager
Joe Jordan, MP, Member of Parliament (Leeds-Grenville |
juin 1997 à janvier 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
Legislative Assistant
Ian Murray, MP, Member of Parliament (Lanark-Carleton) |
septembre 1994 à juin 1997 | Pas une charge désignée |
Legislative Assistant
Jim Jordan, MP, Member of Parliament (Leeds-Grenville) |
décembre 1988 à décembre 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Legislative Assistant
Terry Clifford, MP, Member of Parliament (London-Middlesex) |
décembre 1987 à décembre 1988 | Pas une charge désignée |
Members Assistant
Bud Bradley, MP, Member of Parliament (Haldimand-Norfolk) |
février 1985 à décembre 1987 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Manager, Medical Care Information Database
Health Canada, Policy, Communication & Information Branch |
janvier 1985 à décembre 1992 | Pas une charge désignée |
Research Officer
Health Canada, Health System Branch |
novembre 1977 à décembre 1984 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Consultant, Medical Ethics
Canadian Armed Forces, Not applicable |
juillet 2003 à août 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Director of Public Affairs
Office of the Leader of the Opposition, Communications |
août 2004 à juin 2005 | Pas une charge désignée |
Director of Communications
Office of the Leader of the Opposition, Communications |
juillet 2002 à juillet 2004 | Pas une charge désignée |
Director of Communications
Office of the Leader of the Opposition, Communications |
juillet 1997 à septembre 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
Assistant Director of Media Relations
Office of the Leader of the Reform Party, Media Relations |
avril 1995 à juillet 1997 | Pas une charge désignée |
Communication Officer
Office of the Leader of the Reform Party, Communications |
avril 1994 à avril 1995 | Pas une charge désignée |
Communications Consultant
Department of Foreign Affairs, Communications |
septembre 1992 à mars 1994 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Acting Chief, National Hospital Productivity & Promotion Branch
Health & Welfare Canada, Health Services & Promotion Branch |
décembre 1983 à mars 1990 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Research Analyst, Senior Research Analyst
Statistics Canada, Health Division |
septembre 1978 à octobre 1990 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Statistical Analyst (University co-op placement)
Industry Canada, Automotive & Transportation Division |
1997 à 1997 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Director General
Health Canada, Office of Health and the Information Highway |
2000 à 2002 | Pas une charge désignée |
Regional Director General
Health Canada, Central Region |
1993 à 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
Director General
Health and Welfare Canada, Communications |
1991 à 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Director of Operations and Communications
Privy Council Office, Communications Secretariat |
1988 à 1991 | Pas une charge désignée |
Executive Director
Health and Welfare Canada, Celebration 88 |
1987 à 1988 | Pas une charge désignée |
Director of Evaluation
Transport Canada, Evaluation |
1986 à 1987 | Pas une charge désignée |
Executive Director
Transport Canada, Federal Coordination Secretariat - Expo 86 |
1985 à 1986 | Pas une charge désignée |
Director Policy, Planning and Finance
Transport Canada, Water Transportation Assistance Directorate, Surface Administration |
1981 à 1983 | Pas une charge désignée |
Regional Director Air Planning and Programming
Transport Canada, Air Administration |
1974 à 1980 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Senior Economist
Parks Canada, Policy and analysis branch |
septembre 2003 à 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |
Senior Economist
Transport Canada, Policy and analysis branch |
mai 2002 à juin 2002 | Pas une charge désignée |
Senior Economist
Department of Finance, Forecasting Branch, Consulting work |
septembre 2001 à octobre 2001 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Legal Counsel
Department of Justice, Indian Affairs and Northern Development |
janvier 1999 à février 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
Law Clerk to Federal Court Trial Division Judge, Hon. Max M. Teitelbaum
Federal Court of Canada, Federal Court Trial Division Judge, Hon. Max M. Teitelbaum |
septembre 1996 à août 1997 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
A/Chief, Cardiovascular Disease Section
Bureau of Cardio Respiratory Diseases and Diabetes, Laboratory Centre for Disease Control (LCDC), Health Protection Branch |
mai 2000 à avril 2002 | Pas une charge désignée |
Epidemiologist
Bureau of Cardio Respiratory Diseases and Diabetes, Laboratory Centre for Disease Control (LCDC), Health Protection Branch |
novembre 1999 à mai 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Administrative Assistant
Department of Foreign Affairs, Not applicable |
mai 1996 à juin 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Administrative Assistant
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Office of Protocol |
février 1995 à mai 1995 | Pas une charge désignée |
Administrative Assistant
Department of Human Resources Development Canada, Taskforce on Social Security Reform |
septembre 1994 à janvier 1995 | Pas une charge désignée |
Senior Administrative Assistant
Department of Foreign Affairs, Cultural Affairs and Higher Education Bureau |
avril 1993 à avril 1994 | Pas une charge désignée |
Administrative Assistant
Federal Court of Canada, Trial Division |
novembre 1992 à décembre 1992 | Pas une charge désignée |
Secretary to director general
External Affairs Canada, International Migration |
juillet 1992 à septembre 1992 | Pas une charge désignée |
Assistant project coordinator
Forestry Canada, National Advisory Committee on Model Forests, Science & Sustainable Development |
février 1992 à avril 1992 | Pas une charge désignée |
Secretary to the director
Forestry Canada, Forest Health Research |
juillet 1991 à février 1992 | Pas une charge désignée |
Consultant (Synergem management consultants)
Supply and Services Canada, Public Service Compensation System Project |
mars 1990 à avril 1991 | Pas une charge désignée |