Food, Health & Consumer Products of Canada (FHCP) is the largest industry association in Canada representing the food, health and consumer products industry. Food & Consumer Products of Canada (FCPC) has changed its name to Food, Health & Consumer Products of Canada (FHCP) effective September 1, 2020. Consumer Health Products Canada (CHP Canada) amalgamated with Food & Consumer Products of Canada (FCPC) as of September 1, 2020.
Michael Graydon, Chief Executive Officer
Address:
2700 Matheson Blvd. East, East Tower, Suite 602E
Toronto, ON L4W 4V9
Canada
Telephone number:
613-723-0777
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Food, Health & Consumer Products of Canada/Produits alimentaires, de santé et de consommation du Canada | 2024-05-14 | current |
Food, Health & Consumer Products of Canada/Produits alimentaires, de santé et de consommation du Canada | 2020-09-01 | 2024-05-14 |
FOOD AND CONSUMER PRODUCTS OF CANADA/Produits alimentaires et de consommation du Canada | 2009-04-07 | 2020-09-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Michael Graydon | 2016-07-04 | Current |
NANCY CROITORU | 2003-11-04 | 2016-07-04 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director, Field Services Training and Response
Public Health Agency of Canada, Office of Public Health Practice |
September 2009 to October 2010 | Not a designated office |
Senior Manager
Health Canada, Legislative Renewal Secretariat |
September 2005 to September 2006 | Not a designated office |
Senior Manager Departmental Regulatory Affairs
Health Canada, Health Sciences Policy Division |
May 2004 to September 2004 | Not a designated office |
Acting Director
Health Canada, Health Sciences Policy Division |
December 2003 to May 2004 | Not a designated office |
Manager, Regulatory Development Unit
Health Canada, Assisted Human Reproduction Implementation Office |
May 2003 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Director
Health Canada, Office of International and Regulatory Affairs |
August 2002 to May 2005 | Not a designated office |
Manager, Environmental Assessment Initiative
Health Canada, Office of International and Regulatory Affairs |
August 2001 to August 2002 | Not a designated office |
Senior Policy Analyst
Health Canada, Regulatory Affairs Secretariat |
January 2001 to August 2001 | Not a designated office |
Senior Regulatory Analyst
Health Canada, Bureau of Tobacco Control |
September 1999 to July 2001 | Not a designated office |
Product Safety Officer
Health Canada, Healthy Environments and Consumer Safety Branch |
1999 to September 1999 | Not a designated office |
Tobacco Enforcement Officer
Health Canada, Healthy Environments and Consumer Safety Branch |
1998 to 1999 | Not a designated office |
Environmental Health Officer
Health Canada, Medical Services Branch |
June 1997 to 1998 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Communications
Department of Infrasturcture and Communities, The Hon. John Godfrey's Office, Minister of State Infrastructure and Communities |
August 2004 to February 2006 | Not a designated office |
Director of Commuications/Press Secretary
Department of Agricluture and Agri-Food, The Hon. Bob Speller's Office, Minister of Agriculture |
February 2004 to July 2004 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director, Field Services Training and Response
Public Health Agency of Canada, Office of Public Health Practice |
September 2009 to October 2010 | Not a designated office |
Senior Manager
Health Canada, Legislative Renewal Secretariat |
September 2005 to September 2006 | Not a designated office |
Senior Manager Departmental Regulatory Affairs
Health Canada, Health Sciences Policy Division |
May 2004 to September 2004 | Not a designated office |
Acting Director
Health Canada, Health Sciences Policy Division |
December 2003 to May 2004 | Not a designated office |
Manager, Regulatory Development Unit
Health Canada, Assisted Human Reproduction Implementation Office |
May 2003 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Director
Health Canada, Office of International and Regulatory Affairs |
August 2002 to May 2005 | Not a designated office |
Manager, Environmental Assessment Initiative
Health Canada, Office of International and Regulatory Affairs |
August 2001 to August 2002 | Not a designated office |
Senior Policy Analyst
Health Canada, Regulatory Affairs Secretariat |
January 2001 to August 2001 | Not a designated office |
Senior Regulatory Analyst
Health Canada, Bureau of Tobacco Control |
September 1999 to July 2001 | Not a designated office |
Product Safety Officer
Health Canada, Healthy Environments and Consumer Safety Branch |
1999 to September 1999 | Not a designated office |
Tobacco Enforcement Officer
Health Canada, Healthy Environments and Consumer Safety Branch |
1998 to 1999 | Not a designated office |
Environmental Health Officer
Health Canada, Medical Services Branch |
June 1997 to 1998 | Not a designated office |