Mitacs is a not-for-profit organization that fosters growth and innovation in Canada by solving business challenges with research solutions from academic institutions. Working with more than 100 colleges and universities, thousands of companies, as well as federal, provincial, and territorial governments, Mitacs designs and implements built partnerships that support industrial and social innovation throughout Canada. Mitacs operates across Canada, including main offices in Vancouver, Toronto, Ottawa, and Montreal, and a business development team that works closely with Canada’s universities and colleges. Specifically, the Mitacs business development team is composed of almost 80 people, including 30 roles that are co-funded with strategic partners.
John Hepburn, Chief Executive Officer and Scientific Director
End date of the last completed financial year: 2020-03-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada (ISED) | $75,000,000.00 | Yes |
Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada (ISED) | $500,000.00 | Yes |
Address:
Suite 301, Technology Enterprise Facility
University of British Columbia, 6190 Agronomy Road
Vancouver, BC V6T 1Z3
Canada
Telephone number:
604-822-9189
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Mitacs Inc. | 2024-01-29 | current |
Mitacs Inc. | 2011-08-17 | 2024-01-29 |
MITACS | 2009-01-01 | 2011-08-17 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
John Hepburn | 2020-02-18 | Current |
Jennifer Wilkie | 2019-09-27 | 2020-02-18 |
Alejandro Adem | 2015-02-01 | 2019-09-27 |
Robert Annan | 2014-07-01 | 2015-02-01 |
Arvind Gupta | 2009-01-01 | 2014-07-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director, Strategic Contributions
Innovation Science and Economic Development Canada, Science and Research Sector |
April 2017 to September 2018 | Not a designated office |
Director, Science Partnerships
Industry Canada, Science and Innovation Sector |
2012 to 2017 | Not a designated office |
Director, Knowledge Infrastructure Program
Industry Canada, Science and Innovation Sector |
2009 to 2012 | Not a designated office |
Chief, Science Policy
Industry Canada, Innovation Policy Branch |
1999 to 2009 | Not a designated office |
Manager, Policy and Innovation
Industry Canada, Aboriginal Business Canada |
1993 to 1999 | Not a designated office |
Senior Industry, Trade and Technology Officer
Department of Regional Industrial Expansion, Manitoba Regional Office |
1988 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Defence Scientist
Department of National Defence, Vehicle Mobility Sector |
1982 to 1988 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant Office of the Deputy Prime Minister, Policy and Research
Office of the Deputy Prime Minister, Policy and Research |
February 2003 to October 2003 | Not a designated office |
Program and Policy Advisor Office of the Secretary to the Governor General, Program and Policy
Office of the Secretary to the Governor General, Program and Policy |
January 2002 to November 2002 | Not a designated office |
Communications Advisor
Fisheries and Oceans, Aquaculture |
August 2001 to December 2001 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor
HRDC, Learning and Literacy Secretariat |
January 2001 to July 2001 | Not a designated office |