CANADIAN CANCER SOCIETY IS A REGISTERED CHARITY INCORPORATED UNDER THE CANADA CORPORATIONS ACT AS A NON-PROFIT ORGANIZATION WITHOUT SHARE CAPITAL. THE SOCIETY IS A NATIONAL, COMMUNITY-BASED ORGANIZATION OF VOLUNTEERS, WHOSE MISSION IS THE ERADICATION OF CANCER AND THE ENHANCEMENT OF THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF PEOPLE LIVING WITH CANCER. THE CANADIAN CANCER SOCIETY ACHIEVES ITS MISSION THROUGH RESEARCH, EDUCATION, PATIENT SERVICES AND ADVOCACY FOR HEALTHY PUBLIC POLICY. THESE EFFORTS ARE SUPPORTED BY VOLUNTEERS AND STAFF, AND FUNDS RAISED IN COMMUNITIES ACROSS CANADA.
Andrea Seale, Chief Executive Officer
End date of the last completed financial year: 2021-01-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
British Columbia Provincial Health Services Authority | $2,477,519.00 | Yes |
Canada Revenue Agency (CRA) | $55,491.70 | Yes |
Canadian Partnership Against Cancer | $1,208,448.00 | Yes |
Employment and Social Development Canada (ESDC) | $13,254.00 | Yes |
Environment and Climate Change Canada (ECCC) | $63,000.00 | Yes |
Finance Canada (FIN) | $16,744,941.09 | Yes |
Government of Alberta | $74,249.86 | Yes |
Government of British Columbia | $5,000,000.00 | Yes |
Government of Manitoba | $133,775.23 | Yes |
Government of New Brunswick | $58,000.00 | Yes |
Government of Newfoundland | $141,420.00 | Yes |
Government of Nova Scotia | $303,339.60 | Yes |
Government of Nunavut | $25,000.00 | Yes |
Government of Ontario | $2,155,410.80 | Yes |
Government of Prince Edward Island | $68,118.73 | Yes |
Government of Quebec | $1,798,502.00 | Yes |
Government of Saskatchewan | $231,289.55 | Yes |
Government of Yukon | $85,083.25 | Yes |
Health Canada (HC) | $170,673.50 | Yes |
New Brunswick Regional Development Corporation | $100,000.00 | Yes |
Northern Ontario Heritage Fund Corporation | $87,284.52 | Yes |
Ontario Health (Cancer Care Ontario) | $80,000.04 | Yes |
Ontario Trillium Foundation | $29,900.00 | Yes |
Public Health Agency of Canada (PHAC) | $1,525,146.79 | Yes |
Address:
55 St. Clair Ave W, Suite 300
TORONTO, ON M4V 2Y7
Canada
Telephone number:
604-732-4228
Ext.
1276
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
CANADIAN CANCER SOCIETY/Société canadienne du cancer | 2024-04-08 | current |
CANADIAN CANCER SOCIETY/Société canadienne du cancer | 2008-08-13 | 2024-04-08 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Andrea Seale | 2019-03-01 | Current |
Lynne Hudson | 2016-10-25 | 2019-03-01 |
Anne Vézina | 2016-04-15 | 2016-10-25 |
Pamela Fralick | 2013-01-07 | 2016-04-15 |
Anne Vézina | 2012-06-18 | 2013-01-07 |
PETER GOODHAND | 2009-06-11 | 2012-06-18 |
BARBARA WHYLIE | 2003-11-17 | 2009-06-11 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Correspondence Assistant (summer student)
House of Commons, Office of the Leader of the Opposition |
May 1986 to August 1986 | Not a designated office |
Correspondence Assistant (summer student)
House of Commons, Office of the Leader of the Opposition |
May 1985 to August 1985 | Not a designated office |