Total Number of Communication Reports: 97
Monthly communication reports in the last 6 months: 0
Pollution Probe is a national, non-profit charitable organization that exists to improve the health and well-being of Canadians by advancing policy that achieves positive, tangible environmental change.
Ingrid Thompson, Chief Executive Officer
End date of the last completed financial year: 2016-03-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
City of Calgary | $75,000.00 | No |
Environment Canada | $90,000.00 | Yes |
Health Canada (HC) | $38,744.65 | Yes |
Ministry of Ontario Environment and Climate Change | $28,000.00 | Yes |
National Energy Board (NEB) | $9,800.00 | Yes |
Natural Resources Canada (NRCan) | $116,071.00 | Yes |
Ontario Ministry of Energy | $67,500.00 | Yes |
Power Stream | $31,250.00 | No |
Address:
150 Ferrand Drive, Suite 208
Toronto, ON M3C 3E5
Canada
Telephone number:
416-926-1907
Fax number:
416-926-1907
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
The Pollution Probe Foundation/ | 2024-03-31 | current |
The Pollution Probe Foundation/ | 2016-01-01 | 2024-03-31 |
Pollution Probe | 2008-09-30 | 2016-01-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Christopher Hilkene | 2017-12-01 | Current |
Ingrid Thompson | 2016-10-03 | 2017-12-01 |
Steven McCauley | 2016-01-01 | 2016-10-03 |
Bob Oliver | 2008-09-30 | 2016-01-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director General, Energy and Transportation
Environment Canada, Energy and Transportation Directorate |
November 2008 to November 2014 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director General, Energy and Transportation
Environment Canada, Energy and Transportation Directorate |
November 2008 to November 2014 | Not a designated office |