IAMGOLD is engaged primarily in the exploration for, and the development and production of, mineral resource properties throughout the world.
Stephen J.J. Letwin, Interim President and Chief Executive Officer
Address:
401 Bay Street
Suite 3200
Toronto, ON M5H 2Y4
Canada
Telephone number:
416-933-4954
Fax number:
416-360-4750
IAMGOLD Corporation is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
IAMGOLD Corporation | 2024-03-03 | current |
IAMGOLD Corporation | 2010-04-27 | 2016-08-04 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Renaud Adams | 2024-03-03 | Current |
Stephen J.J. Letwin | 2010-11-01 | 2016-08-04 |
Peter Jones | 2010-04-27 | 2010-11-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Policy Advisor
Industry Canada, Office of the Minister of Industry |
September 2005 to January 2006 | Not a designated office |