Engineering services, particularly with respect submarine refitting and maintenance.
Jerry McLean, Chief Executive Officer
Address:
75 Albert Street, Suite 800
Ottawa, ON K1P 5E7
Canada
Telephone number:
613-567-2764
CSMG Inc. dba Babcock Canada does not have any subsidiaries that could have a direct interest in the outcome of the undertaking
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
CSMG Inc. dba Babcock Canada | 2024-02-28 | current |
CSMG Inc. dba Babcock Canada | 2010-10-14 | 2024-02-28 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Jerry McLean | 2021-11-22 | Current |
Mike Whalley | 2017-05-01 | 2021-11-22 |
Mark Dixon | 2012-11-01 | 2017-05-01 |
Michel Bouchard | 2010-10-14 | 2011-06-02 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director General
PWGSC, Acquisitions |
January 2012 to March 2019 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief of Staff
DND, Materiel Group |
July 2007 to August 2012 | August 8, 2012 |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Commander
Department of National Defence, Royal Canadian Navy |
August 1980 to May 2013 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director General
PWGSC, Acquisitions |
January 2012 to March 2019 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Captain
Department of National Defence, Royal Canadian Air Force |
1989 to December 1998 | Not a designated office |