As Canada’s fifteen leading research universities, the U15 undertake nearly 90 percent of contracted research between the private sector and Canadian universities. The U15 are ranked among the world’s premier research institutions and represent a research enterprise that is valued at over $5 billion in annual research income. Collectively, we produce more than 75 percent of all doctorates awarded in Canada – the talent that drives our national innovation enterprise.
Suzanne Corbeil, Executive Director
Address:
360 Albert Street
Suite 1425
Ottawa, ON K1R 7X7
Canada
Telephone number:
613-695-6855
Fax number:
613-695-7955
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
U15-Group of Canadian Research Universities/U15-Regroupement des universités de recherche du Canada | 2024-04-30 | current |
U15-Group of Canadian Research Universities/U15-Regroupement des universités de recherche du Canada | 2012-05-01 | 2024-04-30 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Chad Gaffield | 2022-04-15 | Current |
Gilles Patry | 2017-10-01 | 2022-04-15 |
Suzanne Corbeil | 2012-05-01 | 2017-10-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Public Affairs and Parliamentary Relations Officer
Canadian Institutes of Health Research, Outreach and Public Affairs |
September 2009 to May 2011 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
Parliament of Canada, Office of the Conflict of Interest and Ethics Commissioner |
November 2007 to May 2008 | Not a designated office |
Parliamentary Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the Hon. Dr. Keith Martin, MP, Esquimalt-Juan de Fuca |
February 2006 to November 2007 | Not a designated office |
Parliamentary Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the Hon. Irwin Cotler, MP, Mont Royal |
August 2005 to January 2006 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Public Affairs and Parliamentary Relations Officer
Canadian Institutes of Health Research, Outreach and Public Affairs |
September 2009 to May 2011 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
Parliament of Canada, Office of the Conflict of Interest and Ethics Commissioner |
November 2007 to May 2008 | Not a designated office |
Parliamentary Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the Hon. Dr. Keith Martin, MP, Esquimalt-Juan de Fuca |
February 2006 to November 2007 | Not a designated office |
Parliamentary Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the Hon. Irwin Cotler, MP, Mont Royal |
August 2005 to January 2006 | Not a designated office |