CF Chemicals Ltd. is a part of CF Industries, a global leader in fertilizer manufacturing and distribution, the second largest nitrogen fertilizer producer in the world and the third largest phosphate fertilizer producer among public companies. CF Industries owns and operates world-scale nitrogen and phosphate plants and serves agricultural and industrial customers through its best-in-class distribution system.
Dale Moverley, General Manager
Address:
1250 52nd Street NW
Medicine Hat, AB T1A 7N1
Canada
Telephone number:
403-525-4333
Terra International (Canada) Inc. does not have any subsidiaries that could have a direct interest in the outcome of the undertaking
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Terra International (Canada) Inc./ | 2024-04-30 | current |
Terra International (Canada) Inc./ | 2013-08-19 | 2024-04-30 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Stephen Jonkhans | 2023-12-01 | Current |
Greg Kennette | 2020-01-27 | 2023-12-01 |
Dale Moverley | 2014-09-01 | 2020-01-27 |
Russell Holowachuk | 2013-08-19 | 2014-09-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief of Staff
House of Commons, Office of the Speaker |
November 2004 to August 2008 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
Canada Revenue Agency, Policy and Legislation |
September 2003 to November 2004 | Not a designated office |