Inter Pipeline is a major petroleum transportation, natural gas liquids processing and bulk liquid storage business based in Calgary, Alberta, Canada. Inter Pipeline owns and operates energy infrastructure assets in western Canada and Europe. Inter Pipeline is a member of the S&P/TSX 60 Index and its common shares trade on the Toronto Stock Exchange under the symbol IPL. www.interpipeline.com
Christian Bayle, President and CEO
End date of the last completed financial year: 2020-12-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Canada Revenue Agency (CRA) | $19,600,000.00 | Yes |
Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada (ISED) | $23,765,523.00 | Yes |
Address:
3200, 215 2nd Street SW
Calgary, AB T2P 1M4
Canada
Telephone number:
403-290-6000
Fax number:
403-290-6092
Inter Pipeline Ltd. is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Inter Pipeline Ltd./ | 2024-05-15 | current |
Inter Pipeline Ltd./ | 2016-10-15 | 2024-05-15 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Paul Hawksworth | 2023-11-01 | Current |
Brian Baker | 2021-10-28 | 2023-11-01 |
Christian Bayle | 2016-10-15 | 2021-10-28 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Junior Policy Analyst
Privy Council Office, Business Transformation & Renewal |
April 2014 to September 2014 | Not a designated office |
Junior Parliamentary Affairs Officer
Natural Resources Canada, Public Affairs and Portfolio Management |
January 2013 to December 2013 | Not a designated office |
Communications Officer
Environment Canada, Climate Change, Clean Air and International Division |
May 2012 to September 2012 | Not a designated office |
Member's Assistant
House of Commons, MP Richard Harris |
September 2011 to April 2012 | Not a designated office |