Gaz Métro est un important distributeur d’énergie. Principale entreprise de distribution de gaz naturel au Québec, elle y exploite un réseau de conduites souterraines de plus de 10 000 km qui dessert plus de 300 municipalités et rejoint plus de 200 000 clients. Gaz Métro est aussi présente au Vermont où elle dessert plus de 310 000 clients. Elle y est active sur le marché de la production d’électricité et sur celui de la distribution d’électricité et de gaz naturel. Gaz Métro s’implique dans le développement et l’exploitation de projets énergétiques porteurs et novateurs tels que le gaz naturel comme carburant et le gaz naturel liquéfié en remplacement d’énergies plus émissives, la production d’énergie éolienne et la valorisation du biométhane.
Sophie Brochu, Présidente et chef de la direction
End date of the last completed financial year: 2016-09-30
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Canada Economic Development for Quebec Regions | $3,388,729.00 | Yes |
Ministère des Transports, de la Mobilité durable et de l'Électrification des transports | $6,250,000.00 | Yes |
Ville d'Asbestos | $0.00 | Yes |
Address:
1717 rue du Havre
Montréal, QC H2K 2X3
Canada
Telephone number:
514-598-3444
Fax number:
514-598-3839
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Energir, L.P./Énergir, s.e.c. | 2024-03-28 | current |
Energir, L.P./Énergir, s.e.c. | 2017-11-29 | 2024-03-28 |
Gaz Métro Limited Partnership/Société en commandite Gaz Métro | 2016-10-01 | 2017-11-29 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Eric Lachance | 2020-01-01 | Current |
Sophie Brochu | 2016-10-01 | 2020-01-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Conseillère spéciale
Chambre des Communes, Cabinet du chef du deuxième parti de l'opposition |
January 2006 to September 2008 | Not a designated office |
Conseillère spéciale
Chambre des Communes, Bureau du Porte-parole de l'opposition en matière d'affaires indiennes |
June 2004 to January 2006 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Conseillère spéciale
Chambre des Communes, Cabinet du chef du deuxième parti de l'opposition |
January 2006 to September 2008 | Not a designated office |
Conseillère spéciale
Chambre des Communes, Bureau du Porte-parole de l'opposition en matière d'affaires indiennes |
June 2004 to January 2006 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Stagiaire
Banque de Développement du Canada, Affaires publiques |
August 2000 to December 2000 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Stagiaire
Ministère de l'Énergie, des Mines et des Ressources, N/A |
1987 to 1987 | Not a designated office |