Hewlett Packard Enterprise Canada Co. (formerly Hewlett Packard Canada Co.) was established in Montreal, Quebec in 1961, and is a leading provider of information technology in Canada.
Mike Hilton, President
Address:
5150 Spectrum Way
Suite 400
Mississauga, ON L4W 5G2
Canada
Telephone number:
844-579-4351
Hewlett Packard Enterprise Canada Co. / Hewlett Packard Enterprise Canada CIE. does not have any subsidiaries that could have a direct interest in the outcome of the undertaking
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Hewlett Packard Enterprise Canada Co./Hewlett Packard Enterprise Canada CIE. | 2024-04-01 | current |
Hewlett Packard Enterprise Canada Co./Hewlett Packard Enterprise Canada CIE. | 2017-02-28 | 2024-04-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Mike Hilton | 2021-01-30 | Current |
Paula Hodgins | 2018-12-03 | 2021-01-30 |
Steve Hershkowitz | 2018-10-01 | 2018-12-03 |
John Dathan | 2017-10-27 | 2018-10-01 |
Charles Atkinson | 2017-02-28 | 2017-10-27 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director & Senior Advisor
Shared Services Canada, CTO Branch |
August 2011 to March 2020 | Not a designated office |
Director & Senior Advisor (Enterprise & Solution Architect)
Public Works and Government Services Canada, CTO Branch |
August 2010 to July 2011 | Not a designated office |
Assistant Director
Statistics Canada, Informatics Branch |
April 1985 to July 2010 | Not a designated office |