Licensed producer of medical marijuana
Miguel Martin, CEO
End date of the last completed financial year: 2021-06-30
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Canadian Revenue Agency (CRA) - Canadian Emergency Wage Subsidy | $31,848,827.90 | Yes |
Address:
4818 31 Street East T9E 0V6
Edmonton International Airport, AB T9E 0V6
Canada
Telephone number:
437-992-8325
Aurora Cannabis Inc. is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Aurora Cannabis Inc./ | 2024-05-15 | current |
Aurora Cannabis Inc./ | 2017-08-04 | 2024-05-15 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Miguel Martin | 2020-09-09 | Current |
Michael Singer | 2020-07-01 | 2020-09-09 |
Steve Dobler | 2017-08-04 | 2020-07-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Policy Advisor
Environment Canada, Canadian Northern Economic Development Agency and the Arctic Council |
January 2015 to December 2015 | December 4, 2015 |
Policy Advisor
Environment Canada, Canadian Northern Economic Development Agency and the Arctic Council |
July 2013 to January 2015 | January 15, 2015 |
Senior Policy Advisor
Health Canada, Canadian Northern Economic Development Agency and the Arctic Council |
January 2012 to July 2013 | July 15, 2013 |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Policy Advisor
Environment Canada, Canadian Northern Economic Development Agency and the Arctic Council |
January 2015 to December 2015 | December 4, 2015 |
Policy Advisor
Environment Canada, Canadian Northern Economic Development Agency and the Arctic Council |
July 2013 to January 2015 | January 15, 2015 |
Senior Policy Advisor
Health Canada, Canadian Northern Economic Development Agency and the Arctic Council |
January 2012 to July 2013 | July 15, 2013 |