Novo Nordisk is a leading global healthcare company, founded in 1923 and headquartered in Denmark. Our purpose is to drive change to defeat diabetes and other serious chronic diseases such as obesity and rare blood and endocrine disorders. We do so by pioneering scientific breakthroughs, expanding access to our medicines, and working to prevent and ultimately cure disease.
Béatrice Clerc, President
Address:
101-2476 Argentia Road
Mississauga, ON L5N 6M1
Canada
Telephone number:
905-629-4222
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Novo Nordisk Canada Inc./ | 2024-04-01 | current |
Novo Nordisk Canada Inc./ | 2017-09-13 | 2024-04-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Vince Lamanna | 2023-06-01 | Current |
Béatrice Clerc | 2019-09-19 | 2023-06-01 |
Brian Hilberdink | 2017-09-13 | 2019-09-17 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Parliamentary Affairs
Parliament of Canada, Senate of Canada |
August 2017 to August 2018 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor
Finance Canada, Office of the Minister of Finance |
October 2011 to November 2014 | November 21, 2014 |