Supply and distribution of fuels and other petroleum products. Operation of retail gasoline stations and convenience stores.
Robert Espey, Chief Executive Officer
End date of the last completed financial year: 2020-12-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Canada Revenue Agency (CRA) | $52,091,638.01 | Yes |
Address:
1800, 240 - 4 Avenue SW
Calgary, AB T2P 4H4
Canada
Telephone number:
403-567-2500
Fax number:
403-567-2599
Parkland Corporation / Corporation Parkland is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Parkland Corporation/Corporation Parkland | 2024-03-01 | current |
Parkland Corporation/Corporation Parkland | 2020-05-15 | 2024-03-01 |
Parkland Fuel Corporation/Corporation Petroles Parkland | 2018-11-13 | 2020-05-15 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant
Natural Resources Canada, Minister's Office |
July 2009 to February 2010 | February 18, 2010 |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant
Natural Resources Canada, Minister's Office |
July 2009 to February 2010 | February 18, 2010 |