Pathways Alliance Inc., formerly Canada’s Oil Sands Innovation Alliance, is comprised of Canada’s largest oil sands producers. It's six companies operate about 95% of Canada’s oil sands production. These companies are committed to working together to address climate change.
Kendall Dilling, President
Address:
520 5th Avenue SW, Suite 1700
Calgary, AB T2P 3R7
Canada
Telephone number:
403-444-5282
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Pathways Alliance Inc./ | 2024-03-04 | current |
Pathways Alliance Inc./ | 2022-06-15 | 2024-03-04 |
Canada’s Oil Sands Innovation Alliance/ | 2019-07-08 | 2022-06-15 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Kendall Dilling | 2022-06-15 | Current |
Wesley Jickling | 2019-08-06 | 2022-06-15 |
John Brogly | 2019-07-08 | 2019-08-06 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Junior Business Officer
Department of Western Economic Diversification, Policy and Strategic Direction |
September 2010 to April 2011 | Not a designated office |
Research Assistant
Aboriginal Affairs and Northern Development Canada, Western Litigation Directorate |
May 2010 to August 2010 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Executive Assistant
Environment Canada, Office of the Minister |
October 2008 to January 2009 | January 31, 2009 |
Executive Assistant
Industry Canada, Office of the Minister |
August 2007 to October 2008 | October 29, 2008 |
Executive Assistant
Indian Affairs and Northern Development Canada, Office of the Minister |
January 2006 to August 2007 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Policy Advisor & Director of Strategic Initiatives
Prime Minister's Office, Policy Division |
July 2008 to September 2009 | September 18, 2009 |
Director of Policy and Research
Prime Minister's Office, Policy Division |
March 2006 to July 2008 | July 15, 2008 |
Senior Policy Advisor
Intergovernmental Affairs, Office of the Minister |
February 1996 to September 1998 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
National Revenue, Office of the Minister |
January 1994 to February 1996 | Not a designated office |