Hydro One is Ontario's largest electricity transmission and distribution company; delivering electricity safely and reliably to over 1.5 million customers across the province of Ontario, and to large industrial customers and municipal utilities.
David Lebeter, President & CEO
End date of the last completed financial year: 2022-12-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Natural Resources Canada (NRCan) | $2,194,296.45 | No |
Address:
483 Bay St.
Toronto, ON M5G 2P5
Canada
Telephone number:
416-345-6000
Hydro One Limited is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Hydro One Limited/ | 2024-03-15 | current |
Hydro One Limited/ | 2020-06-09 | 2024-03-15 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
David Lebeter | 2023-02-01 | Current |
Bill Sheffield | 2022-07-01 | 2023-02-01 |
Mark Poweska | 2020-06-09 | 2022-07-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Advisor
Transportation and Infrastructre, Minister's Office |
October 2008 to June 2010 | June 30, 2010 |