Walmart Canada operates a chain of 408 stores nationwide serving more than 1.5 million customers each day. Walmart Canada's online store, Walmart.ca is visited by more than 900,000 customers daily. With more than 90,000 associates, Walmart Canada is one of Canada's largest employers and is ranked one of the country's top 10 most influential brands.
Gonzalo Gebara, President and CEO
Address:
1940 Argentia Road
Mississauga, ON L5N 1P9
Canada
Telephone number:
905-821-2111
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Wal-Mart Canada Corp./La Compagnie Wal-Mart du Canada | 2024-06-12 | current |
Wal-Mart Canada Corp./La Compagnie Wal-Mart du Canada | 2021-11-10 | 2024-06-12 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Gonzalo Gebara | 2023-01-30 | Current |
JP Suarez | 2022-07-04 | 2023-01-30 |
Horacio Barbeito | 2021-11-10 | 2022-07-04 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Energy Policy Analyst
Natural Resources Canada, Electricity Resources Branch |
November 2016 to July 2017 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
Immigration, Refugees and Citizenship Canada, Strategic Policy and Planning |
March 2015 to November 2016 | Not a designated office |
Performance Auditor
Office of the Auditor General of Canada, Audit Operations |
January 2013 to March 2015 | Not a designated office |
Business Development Officer
Western Economic Diversification Canada, Strategic Policy |
September 2011 to January 2012 | Not a designated office |
Program Analyst
Foreign Affairs Canada, Stabilization and Reconstruction Task Force (Afghanistan) |
January 2011 to August 2011 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Advisor
Office of the Minister of Justice and Attorney General, Department of Justice |
October 2004 to March 2006 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Communications
Office of the Prime Minister, N/A |
March 2015 to October 2015 | October 18, 2015 |