End date of the last completed financial year: 2022-03-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Environment and Climate Change Canada (ECCC) | $120,000.00 | Yes |
Infrastructure Canada (INFC) | $5,500,000.00 | Yes |
Natural Resources Canada (NRCan) | $1,800,000.00 | Yes |
Saskatchewan Public Safety Agency - Disaster Mitigation and Adaptation Fund | $3,500,000.00 | Yes |
SaskBuilds | $50,000,000.00 | No |
Address:
2025 Victoria Avenue
Regina, SK S4P 0S1
Canada
Telephone number:
306-566-3736
Darren Foster, Director, Corp Strategy & Sustainability
SaskPower Corporation is not a coalition.
The activities of SaskPower Corporation are not controlled or directed by another individual, organization or corporation with a direct interest in the outcome of this undertaking.
DOUGLAS RICHARDSON | Public offices held
Firm: Prairie Sky Strategy
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
SaskPower Corporation/ | 2024-04-11 | 2024-08-02 |
SaskPower Corporation/ | 2021-04-07 | 2024-04-11 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief of Staff and Principal Secretary to the Leader of the Opposition
House of Commons, Leader's Office |
March 1985 to September 1987 | Not a designated office |
Chief of Staff to the Minister of Finance
Finance Canada, Department of Finance |
February 1982 to August 1983 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor to the Minister of Justice
Department of Justice, Justice Canada |
June 1972 to August 1972 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor to the Hon. Otto Lang
Minister Responsible for the Canadian Wheat Board, Agriculture Canada |
June 1971 to August 1971 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief of Staff and Principal Secretary to the Leader of the Opposition
House of Commons, Leader's Office |
March 1985 to September 1987 | Not a designated office |
Chief of Staff to the Minister of Finance
Finance Canada, Department of Finance |
February 1982 to August 1983 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor to the Minister of Justice
Department of Justice, Justice Canada |
June 1972 to August 1972 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor to the Hon. Otto Lang
Minister Responsible for the Canadian Wheat Board, Agriculture Canada |
June 1971 to August 1971 | Not a designated office |