Canada’s Research-Based Pharmaceutical Companies (Rx&D) is the association of leading research-based pharmaceutical companies dedicated to improving the health of Canadians through the discovery and development of new medicines and vaccines. Our community represents the men and women working for more than 50 member companies and invests more than $1 billion in research and development each year to fuel Canada’s knowledge-based economy. Guided by our Code of Ethical Practices, our membership is committed to working in partnership with governments, healthcare professionals and stakeholders in a highly ethical manner.
RUSSELL WILLIAMS, PRESIDENT
Address:
55 Metcalfe St.
Suite 1220
Ottawa, ON K1P 6L5
Canada
Telephone number:
613-236-0455
Ext.
425
Fax number:
613-236-6756
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Innovative Medicines Canada/Médicaments novateurs Canada | 2024-04-08 | current |
Innovative Medicines Canada/Médicaments novateurs Canada | 2016-01-04 | 2024-04-08 |
Canada's Research-Based Pharmaceutical Companies | 2008-08-08 | 2016-01-04 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Bettina Hamelin | 2024-04-08 | Current |
David Renwick | 2023-11-17 | 2024-04-08 |
Pamela Fralick | 2016-12-01 | 2023-11-17 |
Elaine Campbell | 2016-06-13 | 2016-12-01 |
RUSSELL WILLIAMS | 2004-08-19 | 2016-06-13 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Manager, Public Affairs
Strategic Communications and Ministerial Affairs, Treasury Board of Canada Secretariat |
March 2011 to August 2012 | Not a designated office |
Senior Communications Strategist
Strategic Communications and Ministerial Affairs, Treasury Board of Canada Secretariat |
July 2009 to February 2011 | Not a designated office |
Media Relations Officer
Public Affairs, Office of the Secretary to the Governor General of Canada |
February 2007 to June 2009 | Not a designated office |
Communications Officer
Communications, Office of the Auditor General of Canada |
April 2004 to January 2007 | Not a designated office |
Clerk, Communications and Marketing/Supervisor, Visitor Services
Public Affairs, Canada Aviation and Space Museum (Science and Technology Museum Corporation |
May 1999 to November 2002 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant to Albina Guarnieri, M.P. - Parliamentary Secretary to the Minister of Canadian Heritage
Canadian Heritage, Parliament Hill Office |
1994 to March 1998 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Manager, Public Affairs
Strategic Communications and Ministerial Affairs, Treasury Board of Canada Secretariat |
March 2011 to August 2012 | Not a designated office |
Senior Communications Strategist
Strategic Communications and Ministerial Affairs, Treasury Board of Canada Secretariat |
July 2009 to February 2011 | Not a designated office |
Media Relations Officer
Public Affairs, Office of the Secretary to the Governor General of Canada |
February 2007 to June 2009 | Not a designated office |
Communications Officer
Communications, Office of the Auditor General of Canada |
April 2004 to January 2007 | Not a designated office |
Clerk, Communications and Marketing/Supervisor, Visitor Services
Public Affairs, Canada Aviation and Space Museum (Science and Technology Museum Corporation |
May 1999 to November 2002 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Contract employee (10 hours/week)
Consumer and Corporate Affairs Canada, Lobbyists Registration Branch |
August 1991 to December 1991 | Not a designated office |
COSEP Summer Student
Consumer and Corporate Affairs Canada, Lobbyists Registration Branch |
March 1991 to July 1991 | Not a designated office |
COSEP Summer Student
Public Works and Government Services Canada, Accommodation/Materiel Managent |
April 1988 to August 1988 | Not a designated office |
Non COSEP (Career-Oriented Student Employment Program) Summer Student
Public Works and Government Services Canada, Accommodation/Materiel Management |
May 1987 to August 1987 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
COSEP Student, Official Languages Commission
Official Language Commission, Language Commission |
1990 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Communications
Canadian Air Transport Security Authority, Communications Branch |
December 2007 to March 2011 | Not a designated office |
A/Director General of Communications
Public Health Agency of Canada, Communications Branch |
September 2004 to December 2006 | Not a designated office |
Director of Operations (EX-01)
Canadian Heritage, Communications Branch |
October 2003 to August 2004 | Not a designated office |
Senior Communications Advisor and Team Leader (IS-06)
Department of Justice Canada, Communications Branch |
April 2000 to September 2003 | Not a designated office |
Senior Project Manager / Policy Analyst (AS-07)
Treasury Board of Canada Secretariat, Human Resources Branch |
April 1998 to March 2000 | Not a designated office |
Crime Prevention Coordinator (IS-05)
Department of Justice Canada, Communications Branch |
December 1994 to March 1998 | Not a designated office |
Senior Communications and Policy Advisor to the Minister and the Ambassador for the Environment
Environment Canada, Minister Office |
January 1991 to September 1992 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant and Communications Advisor to the Minister
Privy Council Office, Minister Office |
January 1989 to December 1991 | Not a designated office |
Communications Advisor to the Minister
Canada Mortgage and Housing, Minister Office |
November 1987 to December 1988 | Not a designated office |