Canada’s Research-Based Pharmaceutical Companies (Rx&D) is the association of leading research-based pharmaceutical companies dedicated to improving the health of Canadians through the discovery and development of new medicines and vaccines. Our community represents the men and women working for more than 50 member companies and invests more than $1 billion in research and development each year to fuel Canada’s knowledge-based economy. Guided by our Code of Ethical Practices, our membership is committed to working in partnership with governments, healthcare professionals and stakeholders in a highly ethical manner.
RUSSELL WILLIAMS, PRESIDENT
Adresse :
55 Metcalfe St.
Suite 1220
Ottawa, ON K1P 6L5
Canada
Numéro de téléphone :
613-236-0455
Poste
425
Numéro de fax :
613-236-6756
Ceci est le nom de l'agent responsable tel qu'indiqué dans l'enregistrement le plus récent de l'entreprise ou de l'organisation.
Nom | De | à |
---|---|---|
Innovative Medicines Canada/Médicaments novateurs Canada | 2024-04-08 | actuel |
Innovative Medicines Canada/Médicaments novateurs Canada | 2016-01-04 | 2024-04-08 |
Canada's Research-Based Pharmaceutical Companies | 2008-08-08 | 2016-01-04 |
Nom de l'agent responsable | De (aaaa-mm-jj) | À (aaaa-mm-jj) |
---|---|---|
Bettina Hamelin | 2024-04-08 | Actuel |
David Renwick | 2023-11-17 | 2024-04-08 |
Pamela Fralick | 2016-12-01 | 2023-11-17 |
Elaine Campbell | 2016-06-13 | 2016-12-01 |
RUSSELL WILLIAMS | 2004-08-19 | 2016-06-13 |
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Manager, Public Affairs
Strategic Communications and Ministerial Affairs, Treasury Board of Canada Secretariat |
mars 2011 à août 2012 | Pas une charge désignée |
Senior Communications Strategist
Strategic Communications and Ministerial Affairs, Treasury Board of Canada Secretariat |
juillet 2009 à février 2011 | Pas une charge désignée |
Media Relations Officer
Public Affairs, Office of the Secretary to the Governor General of Canada |
février 2007 à juin 2009 | Pas une charge désignée |
Communications Officer
Communications, Office of the Auditor General of Canada |
avril 2004 à janvier 2007 | Pas une charge désignée |
Clerk, Communications and Marketing/Supervisor, Visitor Services
Public Affairs, Canada Aviation and Space Museum (Science and Technology Museum Corporation |
mai 1999 à novembre 2002 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant to Albina Guarnieri, M.P. - Parliamentary Secretary to the Minister of Canadian Heritage
Canadian Heritage, Parliament Hill Office |
1994 à mars 1998 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Manager, Public Affairs
Strategic Communications and Ministerial Affairs, Treasury Board of Canada Secretariat |
mars 2011 à août 2012 | Pas une charge désignée |
Senior Communications Strategist
Strategic Communications and Ministerial Affairs, Treasury Board of Canada Secretariat |
juillet 2009 à février 2011 | Pas une charge désignée |
Media Relations Officer
Public Affairs, Office of the Secretary to the Governor General of Canada |
février 2007 à juin 2009 | Pas une charge désignée |
Communications Officer
Communications, Office of the Auditor General of Canada |
avril 2004 à janvier 2007 | Pas une charge désignée |
Clerk, Communications and Marketing/Supervisor, Visitor Services
Public Affairs, Canada Aviation and Space Museum (Science and Technology Museum Corporation |
mai 1999 à novembre 2002 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Contract employee (10 hours/week)
Consumer and Corporate Affairs Canada, Lobbyists Registration Branch |
août 1991 à décembre 1991 | Pas une charge désignée |
COSEP Summer Student
Consumer and Corporate Affairs Canada, Lobbyists Registration Branch |
mars 1991 à juillet 1991 | Pas une charge désignée |
COSEP Summer Student
Public Works and Government Services Canada, Accommodation/Materiel Managent |
avril 1988 à août 1988 | Pas une charge désignée |
Non COSEP (Career-Oriented Student Employment Program) Summer Student
Public Works and Government Services Canada, Accommodation/Materiel Management |
mai 1987 à août 1987 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
COSEP Student, Official Languages Commission
Official Language Commission, Language Commission |
1990 à 1991 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Director of Communications
Canadian Air Transport Security Authority, Communications Branch |
décembre 2007 à mars 2011 | Pas une charge désignée |
A/Director General of Communications
Public Health Agency of Canada, Communications Branch |
septembre 2004 à décembre 2006 | Pas une charge désignée |
Director of Operations (EX-01)
Canadian Heritage, Communications Branch |
octobre 2003 à août 2004 | Pas une charge désignée |
Senior Communications Advisor and Team Leader (IS-06)
Department of Justice Canada, Communications Branch |
avril 2000 à septembre 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |
Senior Project Manager / Policy Analyst (AS-07)
Treasury Board of Canada Secretariat, Human Resources Branch |
avril 1998 à mars 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
Crime Prevention Coordinator (IS-05)
Department of Justice Canada, Communications Branch |
décembre 1994 à mars 1998 | Pas une charge désignée |
Senior Communications and Policy Advisor to the Minister and the Ambassador for the Environment
Environment Canada, Minister Office |
janvier 1991 à septembre 1992 | Pas une charge désignée |
Legislative Assistant and Communications Advisor to the Minister
Privy Council Office, Minister Office |
janvier 1989 à décembre 1991 | Pas une charge désignée |
Communications Advisor to the Minister
Canada Mortgage and Housing, Minister Office |
novembre 1987 à décembre 1988 | Pas une charge désignée |