Innovative Medicines Canada represents Canada’s innovative pharmaceutical industry. We help our members discover, develop, and deliver innovative medicines and vaccines. Our membership consists of more than 50 companies, from established organizations to fledgling startups, all of whom are revolutionizing healthcare through the discovery and development of new medicines and vaccines. Guided by a strict Code of Ethical Practices, we work with governments, insurance companies, healthcare professionals and stakeholders to advance the field and enhance the wellbeing of Canadians. We are committed to being valued partners in Canada’s healthcare system. We aim to achieve these goals by forming effective alliances and supporting policies, improving Canada’s regulatory environment, widen access to innovative medicines and protect intellectual property.
David Renwick, Interim President
Adresse :
55 Metcalfe St.
Suite 1220
Ottawa, ON K1P 6L5
Canada
Numéro de téléphone :
613-236-0455
Ceci est le nom de l'agent responsable tel qu'indiqué dans l'enregistrement le plus récent de l'entreprise ou de l'organisation.
Nom | De | à |
---|---|---|
Innovative Medicines Canada/Médicaments novateurs Canada | 2024-04-08 | actuel |
Innovative Medicines Canada/Médicaments novateurs Canada | 2016-01-04 | 2024-04-08 |
Canada's Research-Based Pharmaceutical Companies | 2008-08-08 | 2016-01-04 |
Nom de l'agent responsable | De (aaaa-mm-jj) | À (aaaa-mm-jj) |
---|---|---|
Bettina Hamelin | 2024-04-08 | Actuel |
David Renwick | 2023-11-17 | 2024-04-08 |
Pamela Fralick | 2016-12-01 | 2023-11-17 |
Elaine Campbell | 2016-06-13 | 2016-12-01 |
RUSSELL WILLIAMS | 2004-08-19 | 2016-06-13 |
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Law Clerk
Federal Court of Canada, No branch or unit |
juillet 2013 à août 2014 | Pas une charge désignée |
Senior Regulatory Officer
Patented Medicine Prices Review Board, Regulatory Affairs and Outreach |
décembre 2008 à juin 2013 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Senior Advisor, Program Delivery
Health Canada, Office of Nutrition Policy and Promotion |
août 2020 à novembre 2020 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
COSEP Student, Official Languages Commission
Official Language Commission, Language Commission |
1990 à 1991 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Jr. Research Analyst
Industry Canada, Industrial Analysis |
2004 à 2004 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant to Albina Guarnieri, M.P. - Parliamentary Secretary to the Minister of Canadian Heritage
Canadian Heritage, Parliament Hill Office |
1994 à mars 1998 | Pas une charge désignée |