Canada's Research-Based Pharmaceutical Companies (Rx&D) is the industry association of Canada's research-based pharmaceutical industry. The companies that make up the membership of Rx&D are engaged in the research and development, production, marketing, and servicing of prescription and non-prescription pharmaceutical products. Rx&D members employ more than 22,000 people across Canada. Comprised of companies of all sizes, Rx&D's membership reflects the international scope of the pharmaceutical industry and includes the Canadian operations of domestic firms. As well as those with headquarters in other countries, Rx&D membership is currently made up of approximately 50 member companies.
RUSSELL WILLIAMS, PRESIDENT
Address:
55 Metcalfe St.
Suite 1220
Ottawa, ON K1P 6L5
Canada
Telephone number:
613-236-0455
Ext.
425
Fax number:
613-236-6756
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Innovative Medicines Canada/Médicaments novateurs Canada | 2024-04-08 | current |
Innovative Medicines Canada/Médicaments novateurs Canada | 2016-01-04 | 2024-04-08 |
Canada's Research-Based Pharmaceutical Companies | 2008-08-08 | 2016-01-04 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Bettina Hamelin | 2024-04-08 | Current |
David Renwick | 2023-11-17 | 2024-04-08 |
Pamela Fralick | 2016-12-01 | 2023-11-17 |
Elaine Campbell | 2016-06-13 | 2016-12-01 |
RUSSELL WILLIAMS | 2004-08-19 | 2016-06-13 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Researcher
Senate of Canada, Senate of Canada |
September 1989 to August 1991 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
The House of Commons, The House of Commons |
July 1987 to September 1989 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Industry Development Officer, Pharmaceutical Sector
Department of Industry Canada, Department of Industry Canada |
1989 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Science and Technology Counsellor
Department of External Affairs, Canadian Embassy in Brussels, Department of External Affairs, Canadian Embassy in Brussels |
1986 to 1989 | Not a designated office |
Grants Officer, University-Industry Program
Natural Sciences and Engineering Research Council, Natural Sciences and Engineering Research Council |
1983 to 1996 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant to Albina Guarnieri, M.P. - Parliamentary Secretary to the Minister of Canadian Heritage
Canadian Heritage, Parliament Hill Office |
1994 to March 1998 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Advisor and Special Assistant
Office of the Minister of Citizenship and Immigration and Senior Political Minister of Ontario, Citizenship & Immigration |
January 2005 to March 2005 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
Office of the Minister of Human Resources and Skills Development and Senior Political Minister for Ontario, Human Resources |
January 2004 to January 2005 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
Office of the Minister of Human Resources Development, Human Resources |
September 2002 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Senior Advisor, Corporate Affairs
Human Resources Development Canada, Human Resources |
September 2001 to September 2002 | Not a designated office |
Advisor, Advocacy and Cabinet Affairs
Atlantic Canada Opportunities Agency, Atlantic Canada Opportunities Agency |
November 2000 to August 2001 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
COSEP Student, Official Languages Commission
Official Language Commission, Language Commission |
1990 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Researcher
Senate of Canada, Senate of Canada |
September 1989 to August 1991 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
The House of Commons, The House of Commons |
July 1987 to September 1989 | Not a designated office |