Canada’s Research-Based Pharmaceutical Companies (Rx&D) is the association of leading research-based pharmaceutical companies dedicated to improving the health of Canadians through the discovery and development of new medicines and vaccines. Our community represents 15,000 men and women working for 50 member companies and invests more than $1 billion in research and development each year to fuel Canada’s knowledge-based economy. Guided by our Code of Ethical Practices, our membership is committed to working in partnership with governments, healthcare professionals and stakeholders in a highly ethical manner.
RUSSELL WILLIAMS, PRESIDENT
Address:
55 Metcalfe St.
Suite 1220
Ottawa, ON K1P 6L5
Canada
Telephone number:
613-236-0455
Ext.
425
Fax number:
613-236-6756
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Innovative Medicines Canada/Médicaments novateurs Canada | 2024-04-08 | current |
Innovative Medicines Canada/Médicaments novateurs Canada | 2016-01-04 | 2024-04-08 |
Canada's Research-Based Pharmaceutical Companies | 2008-08-08 | 2016-01-04 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Bettina Hamelin | 2024-04-08 | Current |
David Renwick | 2023-11-17 | 2024-04-08 |
Pamela Fralick | 2016-12-01 | 2023-11-17 |
Elaine Campbell | 2016-06-13 | 2016-12-01 |
RUSSELL WILLIAMS | 2004-08-19 | 2016-06-13 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Contract employee (10 hours/week)
Consumer and Corporate Affairs Canada, Lobbyists Registration Branch |
August 1991 to December 1991 | Not a designated office |
COSEP Summer Student
Consumer and Corporate Affairs Canada, Lobbyists Registration Branch |
March 1991 to July 1991 | Not a designated office |
COSEP Summer Student
Public Works and Government Services Canada, Accommodation/Materiel Managent |
April 1988 to August 1988 | Not a designated office |
Non COSEP (Career-Oriented Student Employment Program) Summer Student
Public Works and Government Services Canada, Accommodation/Materiel Management |
May 1987 to August 1987 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant
Privy Council Office (PCO), Office of the Government House Leader |
August 2004 to January 2006 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant (Policy)
Transport Canada, Office of the Minister of Transport |
December 2003 to July 2004 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
House of Commons, Office of M.P. for Hamilton East - Stoney Creek |
July 2001 to November 2003 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Office of M.P. for Hamilton Mountain |
December 2000 to June 2001 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant to Albina Guarnieri, M.P. - Parliamentary Secretary to the Minister of Canadian Heritage
Canadian Heritage, Parliament Hill Office |
1994 to March 1998 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Advisor and Special Assistant
Office of the Minister of Citizenship and Immigration and Senior Political Minister of Ontario, Citizenship & Immigration |
January 2005 to March 2005 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
Office of the Minister of Human Resources and Skills Development and Senior Political Minister for Ontario, Human Resources |
January 2004 to January 2005 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
Office of the Minister of Human Resources Development, Human Resources |
September 2002 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Senior Advisor, Corporate Affairs
Human Resources Development Canada, Human Resources |
September 2001 to September 2002 | Not a designated office |
Advisor, Advocacy and Cabinet Affairs
Atlantic Canada Opportunities Agency, Atlantic Canada Opportunities Agency |
November 2000 to August 2001 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Contract employee (10 hours/week)
Consumer and Corporate Affairs Canada, Lobbyists Registration Branch |
August 1991 to December 1991 | Not a designated office |
COSEP Summer Student
Consumer and Corporate Affairs Canada, Lobbyists Registration Branch |
March 1991 to July 1991 | Not a designated office |
COSEP Summer Student
Public Works and Government Services Canada, Accommodation/Materiel Managent |
April 1988 to August 1988 | Not a designated office |
Non COSEP (Career-Oriented Student Employment Program) Summer Student
Public Works and Government Services Canada, Accommodation/Materiel Management |
May 1987 to August 1987 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
COSEP Student, Official Languages Commission
Official Language Commission, Language Commission |
1990 to 1991 | Not a designated office |