Innovative Medicines Canada represents Canada’s innovative pharmaceutical industry. We help our members discover, develop, and deliver innovative medicines and vaccines. Our membership consists of more than 50 companies, from established organizations to fledgling startups, all of whom are revolutionizing healthcare through the discovery and development of new medicines and vaccines. Guided by a strict Code of Ethical Practices, we work with governments, insurance companies, healthcare professionals and stakeholders to advance the field and enhance the wellbeing of Canadians. We are committed to being valued partners in Canada’s healthcare system. We aim to achieve these goals by forming effective alliances and supporting policies, improving Canada’s regulatory environment, widen access to innovative medicines and protect intellectual property.
Elaine Campbell, Interim President
Address:
55 Metcalfe St.
Suite 1220
Ottawa, ON K1P 6L5
Canada
Telephone number:
613-236-0455
Ext.
725
Fax number:
613-236-6756
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Innovative Medicines Canada/Médicaments novateurs Canada | 2024-04-08 | current |
Innovative Medicines Canada/Médicaments novateurs Canada | 2016-01-04 | 2024-04-08 |
Canada's Research-Based Pharmaceutical Companies | 2008-08-08 | 2016-01-04 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Bettina Hamelin | 2024-04-08 | Current |
David Renwick | 2023-11-17 | 2024-04-08 |
Pamela Fralick | 2016-12-01 | 2023-11-17 |
Elaine Campbell | 2016-06-13 | 2016-12-01 |
RUSSELL WILLIAMS | 2004-08-19 | 2016-06-13 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Manager, Public Affairs
Strategic Communications and Ministerial Affairs, Treasury Board of Canada Secretariat |
March 2011 to August 2012 | Not a designated office |
Senior Communications Strategist
Strategic Communications and Ministerial Affairs, Treasury Board of Canada Secretariat |
July 2009 to February 2011 | Not a designated office |
Media Relations Officer
Public Affairs, Office of the Secretary to the Governor General of Canada |
February 2007 to June 2009 | Not a designated office |
Communications Officer
Communications, Office of the Auditor General of Canada |
April 2004 to January 2007 | Not a designated office |
Clerk, Communications and Marketing/Supervisor, Visitor Services
Public Affairs, Canada Aviation and Space Museum (Science and Technology Museum Corporation |
May 1999 to November 2002 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant to Albina Guarnieri, M.P. - Parliamentary Secretary to the Minister of Canadian Heritage
Canadian Heritage, Parliament Hill Office |
1994 to March 1998 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Press Secretary (Ontario)
House of Commons, Opposition Leader's Office |
January 2013 to September 2013 | Not a designated office |
Press Secretary (Ontario) (Acting)
House of Commons, Opposition Leader's Office |
October 2012 to December 2012 | Not a designated office |
Communications Officer (Writer)
House of Commons, Opposition Leader's Office |
February 2012 to September 2012 | Not a designated office |
Parliamentary Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Jamie Nicholls, MP |
July 2011 to February 2012 | Not a designated office |
Member's Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Judy Wasylycia-Leis, MP |
March 2010 to March 2010 | Not a designated office |
Research Assistant
House of Commons, Office of John Rafferty, MP |
September 2008 to March 2011 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
COSEP Student, Official Languages Commission
Official Language Commission, Language Commission |
1990 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Part Time Customs Officer
Canada Customs and Revenue, Windsor-Detroit Border |
1991 to 1993 | Not a designated office |