Innovative Medicines Canada represents Canada’s innovative pharmaceutical industry. We help our members discover, develop, and deliver innovative medicines and vaccines. Our membership consists of more than 50 companies, from established organizations to fledgling startups, all of whom are revolutionizing healthcare through the discovery and development of new medicines and vaccines. Guided by a strict Code of Ethical Practices, we work with governments, insurance companies, healthcare professionals and stakeholders to advance the field and enhance the wellbeing of Canadians. We are committed to being valued partners in Canada’s healthcare system. We aim to achieve these goals by forming effective alliances and supporting policies, improving Canada’s regulatory environment, widen access to innovative medicines and protect intellectual property.
Pamela Fralick, President
Address:
55 Metcalfe St.
Suite 1220
Ottawa, ON K1P 6L5
Canada
Telephone number:
613-236-0455
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Innovative Medicines Canada/Médicaments novateurs Canada | 2024-04-08 | current |
Innovative Medicines Canada/Médicaments novateurs Canada | 2016-01-04 | 2024-04-08 |
Canada's Research-Based Pharmaceutical Companies | 2008-08-08 | 2016-01-04 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Bettina Hamelin | 2024-04-08 | Current |
David Renwick | 2023-11-17 | 2024-04-08 |
Pamela Fralick | 2016-12-01 | 2023-11-17 |
Elaine Campbell | 2016-06-13 | 2016-12-01 |
RUSSELL WILLIAMS | 2004-08-19 | 2016-06-13 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief of Staff
Indian and Northern Affairs, Indian and Northern Affairs |
July 2007 to November 2008 | Not a designated office |
Director of Communications
Ministry of Agriculture, Communications |
February 2006 to July 2007 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Law Clerk
Federal Court of Canada, No branch or unit |
July 2013 to August 2014 | Not a designated office |
Senior Regulatory Officer
Patented Medicine Prices Review Board, Regulatory Affairs and Outreach |
December 2008 to June 2013 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief of Staff
Indian and Northern Affairs, Indian and Northern Affairs |
July 2007 to November 2008 | Not a designated office |
Director of Communications
Ministry of Agriculture, Communications |
February 2006 to July 2007 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
COSEP Student, Official Languages Commission
Official Language Commission, Language Commission |
1990 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Deputy Chief Executive Officer/Director of Liaison and Coordination
Health Canada, Canadian Centre for Substance Abuse |
August 1991 to March 1997 | Not a designated office |
Chief
Health Canada, Alcohol and Drugs Unit, Ottawa |
January 1990 to July 1991 | Not a designated office |
Program Coordinator (ES - Economics and Statistics)
Health Canada, Alcohol and Drugs Unit, Ottawa |
April 1989 to January 1990 | Not a designated office |
Regional Drug Education Coordinator
Department of National Defense, Lahr, Germany |
July 1984 to February 1989 | Not a designated office |
Counsellor, Senior Counsellor
Department of National Defense, Alcoholism Rehabilitation Clinic, Lahr, Germany |
November 1980 to July 1984 | Not a designated office |
Coordinator/Evaluator
Health and Welfare Canada, Student Projects Program |
June 1978 to September 1978 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Jr. Research Analyst
Industry Canada, Industrial Analysis |
2004 to 2004 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant to Albina Guarnieri, M.P. - Parliamentary Secretary to the Minister of Canadian Heritage
Canadian Heritage, Parliament Hill Office |
1994 to March 1998 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Administrative Assistant
Canadian Air Transport Security Authority, Corporate Services |
November 2010 to March 2016 | Not a designated office |