Cameco, with its head office in Saskatoon, Saskatchewan, is the world's largest uranium supplier. The company's uranium products are used to generate electricity in nuclear energy plants around the world, providing one of the cleanest sources of energy available today. Cameco's shares trade on the Toronto and New York Stock Exchanges.
Tim Gitzel, President and Chief Executive Officer
Address:
2121-11TH STREET WEST
SASKATOON, SK S7M 1J3
Canada
Telephone number:
306-956-6304
CAMECO CORPORATION is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
CAMECO CORPORATION | 2024-04-08 | current |
CAMECO CORPORATION | 2008-07-10 | 2024-04-08 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Tim Gitzel | 2011-07-01 | Current |
GERALD GRANDEY | 1996-01-31 | 2011-07-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Advisor
Department of Finance, Ministers' Regional Office |
January 2004 to August 2005 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Consul/Head of Mission, Canadian Consulate in Chongqing
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Chongqing, China |
August 2009 to June 2011 | Not a designated office |
Trade Commissioner, Canadian Consulate in Chongqing
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Chongqing, China |
September 2008 to July 2009 | Not a designated office |
Trade Commissioner, Canadian Embassy in Colombia
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Bogota, Colombia |
September 2004 to July 2006 | Not a designated office |
Trade Commissioner, Mexico Division
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Mexico Division |
April 2002 to March 2004 | Not a designated office |