Universities Canada has represented Canada's universities since 1911. We are the voice of Canada's universities. Our advocacy ensures that higher education is recognized as vital to Canada's prosperity and quality of life as a knowledge-based society and economy. We are a non-governmental and not-for-profit organization, funded through membership fees and revenues from contract management services and publications. Our mandate is to facilitate the development of public policy on higher education and to encourage cooperation among universities and governments, industry, communities, and institutions in other countries. We provide services to member universities in three main areas: public policy and advocacy; communication, research and information-sharing; and scholarships and international programs.
Paul Davidson, President
End date of the last completed financial year: 2017-03-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Canadian Heritage (PCH) | $23,511.00 | Yes |
Address:
350 Albert Street, Suite 1710
Ottawa, ON K1R 1B1
Canada
Telephone number:
613-563-1236
Ext.
232
Fax number:
613-563-9745
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Universities Canada/Universités Canada | 2024-03-18 | current |
Universities Canada/Universités Canada | 2015-04-22 | 2024-03-18 |
Association of Universities and Colleges of Canada/Association des universités et collèges du Canada | 2008-08-15 | 2015-04-22 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Gabriel Miller | 2024-03-18 | Current |
Philip Landon | 2023-07-01 | 2024-03-18 |
Paul Davidson | 2009-05-11 | 2023-07-01 |
CLAIRE M. MORRIS | 2005-06-07 | 2009-05-11 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Research Analyst
Aboriginal Affairs and Northern Development Canada, Resolution and Individual Affairs |
October 2010 to November 2011 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant at the House of Commons
House of Commons, House of Commons |
May 2016 to October 2017 | Not a designated office |
Constituency Office Manager at the House of Commons
House of Commons, House of Commons |
November 2015 to May 2016 | Not a designated office |
Parliamentary Assistant at the House of Commons
House of Commons, House of Commons |
August 2010 to June 2012 | Not a designated office |
Administrative Officer at NSERC
NSERC, NSERC |
April 2007 to August 2008 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Policy Analyst
Citizenship and Immigration Canada, Strategic Policy Branch |
2006 to August 2011 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Youth Mobility and Academic Relations |
2004 to 2006 | Not a designated office |
Junior Policy Analyst/Policy Analyst
Human Resources and Skills Development Canada, Canada Student Loans Program |
2002 to 2004 | Not a designated office |
Junior Communications Officer
Canadian Food Inspection Agency, Communications Branch |
2001 to 2001 | Not a designated office |
Page
House of Commons, House of Commons |
1999 to 2000 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Analyst
Human Resources and Social Development Canada (HRSDC), Learning Policy Directorate / Intergovernmental Relations Directorate |
September 2012 to May 2017 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
Canada School of the Public Service, Innovation in Public Management Branch |
May 2006 to May 2007 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
Health Canada, Deputy Ministers's Office / Department Secretariat Division - Admin Services |
January 2000 to May 2000 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
Health Canada, Senior Assistant Deputy Minister's Office / corporate Service Branch - Admin Ser |
December 1994 to November 1995 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Parliamentary Intern in the House of Commons through the Parliamentary Internship Programme
House of Commons, House of Commons |
September 2013 to June 2014 | Not a designated office |
Tour Guide with the National Capital Commission
National Capital Commission, National Capital Commission |
May 2011 to September 2011 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Administrative Assistant
House of Commons, House of Commons |
April 2006 to January 2007 | Not a designated office |
Member's Assistant
House of Commons, House of Commons |
September 2005 to March 2006 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Program Officer
Canadian International Development Agency, Canadian Partnership Branch |
May 2002 to May 2003 | Not a designated office |
Full-time consultant
Canadian International Development Agency, Canadian Partnership Branch |
March 2002 to April 2002 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Analyst
Social Sciences and Humanities Research Council, Corporate Strategy and Performance |
October 2010 to December 2015 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
Environment Canada, Multilateral and Bilateral Affairs, International Affairs Branch |
June 2009 to September 2009 | Not a designated office |
Administrative Assistant
Environment Canada, Assistant Deputy Minister’s Office, International Affairs Branch |
October 2006 to January 2008 | Not a designated office |
Administrative Assistant
Environment Canada, Greenhouse Gas Reductions Directorate, Environmental Stewardship Branch |
November 2005 to October 2006 | Not a designated office |