Universities Canada has represented Canada's universities since 1911. We are the voice of Canada's universities. Our advocacy ensures that higher education is recognized as vital to Canada's prosperity and quality of life as a knowledge-based society and economy. We are a non-governmental and not-for-profit organization, funded through membership fees and revenues from contract management services and publications. Our mandate is to facilitate the development of public policy on higher education and to encourage cooperation among universities and governments, industry, communities, and institutions in other countries. We provide services to member universities in three main areas: public policy and advocacy; communication, research and information-sharing; and scholarships and international programs.
Paul Davidson, President
End date of the last completed financial year: 2023-03-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Canadian Heritage (PCH) | $129,791.00 | Yes |
Canadian Institutes of Health Research (CIHR) | $25,000.00 | Yes |
National Research Council (NRC) | $1,000.00 | Yes |
Natural Sciences and Engineering Research Council (NSERC) | $25,000.00 | Yes |
Social Sciences and Humanities Research Council (SSHRC) | $25,000.00 | Yes |
Address:
350 Albert Street, Suite 1710
Ottawa, ON K1R 1B1
Canada
Telephone number:
613-563-1236
Ext.
232
Fax number:
613-563-9745
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Universities Canada/Universités Canada | 2024-03-18 | current |
Universities Canada/Universités Canada | 2015-04-22 | 2024-03-18 |
Association of Universities and Colleges of Canada/Association des universités et collèges du Canada | 2008-08-15 | 2015-04-22 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Gabriel Miller | 2024-03-18 | Current |
Philip Landon | 2023-07-01 | 2024-03-18 |
Paul Davidson | 2009-05-11 | 2023-07-01 |
CLAIRE M. MORRIS | 2005-06-07 | 2009-05-11 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Analyst
Treasury Board Secretariat, Service Management, Digital Policy and Service Sector |
May 2021 to August 2022 | Not a designated office |
Junior Policy Analyst
Environment and Climate Change Canada, Sustainability Directorate, Strategic Policy Branch |
May 2020 to December 2020 | Not a designated office |
Junior Program Officer
Canadian Heritage, Official Languages Branch |
May 2019 to August 2019 | Not a designated office |
Intern
House of Commons, Office of MP Guy Caron |
May 2018 to July 2018 | Not a designated office |
Intern
House of Commons, Office of MP Hélène Laverdière |
September 2017 to December 2017 | Not a designated office |
Tour Guide
House of Commons, Library of Parliament |
May 2017 to September 2017 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Issues Manager
House of Commons, Offices of the Leader and Whip of the New Democratic Party of Canada |
December 2021 to April 2023 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Jenny Kwan MP |
June 2020 to December 2021 | Not a designated office |
Communications and Stakeholder Engagement Officer
Ship-source Oil Pollution Fund/ Fund for Rail Accidents Involving Designated Goods, Corporate Services |
March 2020 to June 2020 | Not a designated office |
House Leader's Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the House Leader of the New Democratic Party of Canada |
January 2020 to March 2020 | Not a designated office |
Parliamentary Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Matthew Dubé, MP |
January 2018 to October 2019 | Not a designated office |
Constituency Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Irene Mathyssen MP |
July 2017 to December 2017 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Telephone Interviewer
Statistics Canada, Statistical Survey Operations |
September 2015 to February 2016 | Not a designated office |
Parliamentary Guide
Parliament of Canada, Library of Parliament |
May 2015 to September 2015 | Not a designated office |
Telephone Interviewer
Statistics Canada, Statistical Survey Operations |
March 2015 to May 2015 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Member's Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Alistair MacGregor, MP |
January 2018 to March 2022 | Not a designated office |
Constituency Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Murray Rankin, MP |
May 2017 to January 2018 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Junior Policy Analyst
Environment and Climate Change Canada, Meteorological Service |
February 2019 to June 2019 | Not a designated office |
Program Assistant
Crown-Indigenous Relations and Northern Affairs Canada, Northern Affairs Office |
September 2017 to December 2017 | Not a designated office |
Junior Environmental Officer
Environment and Climate Change Canada, Environmental Protection Branch |
May 2017 to August 2017 | Not a designated office |
Youth Engagement Assistant
Environment and Climate Change Canada, Meteorological Service of Canada |
January 2017 to May 2017 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Analyst
Treasury Board Secretariat, Service Management, Digital Policy and Service Sector |
May 2021 to August 2022 | Not a designated office |
Junior Policy Analyst
Environment and Climate Change Canada, Sustainability Directorate, Strategic Policy Branch |
May 2020 to December 2020 | Not a designated office |
Junior Program Officer
Canadian Heritage, Official Languages Branch |
May 2019 to August 2019 | Not a designated office |
Intern
House of Commons, Office of MP Guy Caron |
May 2018 to July 2018 | Not a designated office |
Intern
House of Commons, Office of MP Hélène Laverdière |
September 2017 to December 2017 | Not a designated office |
Tour Guide
House of Commons, Library of Parliament |
May 2017 to September 2017 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Parliamentary Assistant
House of Commons, Office of MP Julie Dzerowicz |
February 2021 to January 2023 | Not a designated office |