The Association of Universities and Colleges of Canada has represented Canada's universities since 1911. We are the voice of Canada's universities. Our advocacy ensures that higher education is recognized as vital to Canada's prosperity and quality of life as a knowledge-based society and economy. We are a non-governmental and not-for-profit organization, funded through membership fees and revenues from contract management services and publications. Our mandate is to facilitate the development of public policy on higher education and to encourage cooperation among universities and governments, industry, communities, and institutions in other countries. We provide services to member universities in three main areas: public policy and advocacy; communication, research and information-sharing; and scholarships and international programs.
CLAIRE M. MORRIS, PRESIDENT and CEO
Date de la fin du dernier exercice financier complet : 2008-03-31
Institution gouvernementale | Financement reçu au cours du dernier exercice financier | Financement attendu pendant l'exercice financier en cours |
---|---|---|
Affaires étrangères et Commerce international Canada (MAECIC) | 37 805,00 $ | Oui |
Canadian Air Transport Security Authority | 1 500,00 $ | Non |
Canadian Embassy, Washington, D.C. | 5 250,00 $ | Non |
Canadian Heritage/Canada Post subsidy, Publications Assistance Program | 7 139,00 $ | Oui |
Canadian International Development Agency - Students for Development | 1 588 821,00 $ | Oui |
Canadian International Development Agency - University Partnerships in Cooperation and Development | 9 898 930,00 $ | Oui |
Défense nationale (MDN) | 417 000,00 $ | Oui |
International Development Research Centre - Canada-Latin America Caribbean Research Exchange Grants | 149 750,00 $ | Oui |
International Development Research Centre partnership grant | 60 581,00 $ | Oui |
Sécurité publique Canada (SP) | 3 000,00 $ | Oui |
Adresse :
350 Albert Street, Suite 600
Ottawa, ON K1R 1B1
Canada
Numéro de téléphone :
613-563-1236
Numéro de fax :
613-563-9745
Ceci est le nom de l'agent responsable tel qu'indiqué dans l'enregistrement le plus récent de l'entreprise ou de l'organisation.
Nom | De | à |
---|---|---|
Universities Canada/Universités Canada | 2024-03-18 | actuel |
Universities Canada/Universités Canada | 2015-04-22 | 2024-03-18 |
Association of Universities and Colleges of Canada/Association des universités et collèges du Canada | 2008-08-15 | 2015-04-22 |
Nom de l'agent responsable | De (aaaa-mm-jj) | À (aaaa-mm-jj) |
---|---|---|
Gabriel Miller | 2024-03-18 | Actuel |
Philip Landon | 2023-07-01 | 2024-03-18 |
Paul Davidson | 2009-05-11 | 2023-07-01 |
CLAIRE M. MORRIS | 2005-06-07 | 2009-05-11 |
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Summer student
Parks Canada, Summer Employment Center |
avril 1970 à septembre 1970 | Pas une charge désignée |
Summer student
Parks Canada, Summer Employment Center |
avril 1969 à septembre 1969 | Pas une charge désignée |
Summer student
Parks Canada, Summer Employment Center |
avril 1968 à septembre 1968 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Summer student
Parks Canada, Summer Employment Center |
avril 1970 à septembre 1970 | Pas une charge désignée |
Summer student
Parks Canada, Summer Employment Center |
avril 1969 à septembre 1969 | Pas une charge désignée |
Summer student
Parks Canada, Summer Employment Center |
avril 1968 à septembre 1968 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Senior Policy Analyst
Canadian Centre for Management Development, Research Branch |
décembre 1991 à décembre 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Program Analyst
Treasury Board, Program Branch |
décembre 1981 à décembre 1991 | Pas une charge désignée |
Foreign Service Officer
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Federal-Provincial Coordination |
octobre 1980 à décembre 1981 | Pas une charge désignée |
Foreign Service Officer
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Canadian Embassy Vienna Austria |
octobre 1978 à septembre 1980 | Pas une charge désignée |
Foreign Service Officer
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, German Language Training |
août 1978 à octobre 1978 | Pas une charge désignée |
Foreign Service Officer
Department of Foreign Affiars and International Trade, Commodity Policy Unit |
octobre 1977 à août 1978 | Pas une charge désignée |
Foreign Service Officer
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Consular Policy Unit |
juillet 1977 à septembre 1977 | Pas une charge désignée |
Parliamentary Returns Officer
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Minister's Office |
octobre 1975 à août 1976 | Pas une charge désignée |
Foreign Service Officer
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Aid and Development Division |
juillet 1974 à décembre 1974 | Pas une charge désignée |
Foreign Service Officer
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, French Language Training |
avril 1974 à juin 1974 | Pas une charge désignée |
Foreign Service Officer
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Northwestern European Division |
novembre 1973 à avril 1974 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Senior Analyst
Department of the Secretary of State of Canada, Education Support Branch |
1983 à 1988 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Temporary administrative assistant
Elections Canada, Election unit |
juin 2004 à juin 2004 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Summer student
Industry Canada, Machinery and Equipment Advisory Board |
avril 1974 à septembre 1974 | Pas une charge désignée |
Summer student
Industry Canada, Machinery and Equipment Advisory Board, Machinery Branch |
avril 1973 à septembre 1973 | Pas une charge désignée |
Summer student
Industry Canada, Machinery and Equipment Advisory Board, Machinery Branch |
avril 1972 à septembre 1972 | Pas une charge désignée |
Summer student
Industry Canada, Machinery and Equipment Advisory Board, Machinery Branch |
avril 1971 à septembre 1971 | Pas une charge désignée |
Summer student
Industry Canada, Machinery Equipment Advisory Board, Machinery Branch |
avril 1970 à septembre 1970 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Summer assistant
Library of Parliament, Federal part-time student employment program |
septembre 1989 à mai 1990 | Pas une charge désignée |
Student assistant
Library of Parliament, Federal part-time student employment program |
septembre 1988 à avril 1989 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Director of Parliamentary Affairs
Natural Resources Canada, Office of the Minister |
novembre 2005 à janvier 2006 | Pas une charge désignée |
Senior Policy Advisor and Director of Parliamentary Affairs
Minister of State (Public Health), Health Canada, Office of the Minister of State |
décembre 2003 à novembre 2005 | Pas une charge désignée |
Executive Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Carolyn Bennett, MP St. Paul's Ontario |
février 2002 à décembre 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |
Policy Analyst
Health Canada, Policy Development Division, Health Promotions Branch |
janvier 1998 à décembre 1998 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Research and Policy Analyst, Stategic Policy and Planning
Health Canada, First Nation and Inuit Health Branch |
août 2004 à novembre 2004 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Svend Robinson, MP Burnaby Douglas |
janvier 1997 à décembre 1999 | Pas une charge désignée |
Communications Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Svend Robinson, MP Burnably Douglas |
janvier 1995 à décembre 1997 | Pas une charge désignée |
Legislative and Communications Assistant
House of Commons, Office of John Brewin, MP Victoria |
janvier 1993 à décembre 1994 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Economist/Statistician (ES)
Transport Canada, Intelligent Transportation Systems Policy Branch |
avril 2003 à octobre 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |
Commerce Officer (CO)
Industry Canada, Federal-provincial Relations Division |
août 2002 à mai 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Press Secretary
House of Commons, Office of the Leader, New Democratic Party |
octobre 1984 à décembre 1990 | Pas une charge désignée |
Project Officer
Energy, Mines and Resources Canada, Energy Conservation Information Centres |
octobre 1978 à décembre 1979 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Intern
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Parliamentary Centre, Youth International Internship Program |
novembre 1997 à mars 1998 | Pas une charge désignée |
Intern
Indian and Northern Affairs Canada, Circumpolar Liaison Directorate |
janvier 1987 à mars 1997 | Pas une charge désignée |
Summer Student
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Permanent Mission of Canada to the United Nations. New York, New York |
juin 1985 à août 1985 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Temporary assignment
House of Commons, Constituency office, Joe Fontana MP London ON |
1991 à 1991 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Part-time contract work
Department of Justice, Contractual services unit |
1989 à 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Deputy Minister
Privy Council Office of Canada, Intergovernmental Affairs |
mai 2002 à avril 2004 | Pas une charge désignée |
Deputy Minister
Human Resources Development Canada, Office of the Deputy Minister |
février 1999 à mai 2002 | Pas une charge désignée |
Associate Deputy Minister
Human Resources Development Canada, Office of the Associate Deputy Minister |
décembre 1998 à février 1999 | Pas une charge désignée |