The Association of Universities and Colleges of Canada has represented Canada's universities since 1911. We are the voice of Canada's universities. Our advocacy ensures that higher education is recognized as vital to Canada's prosperity and quality of life as a knowledge-based society and economy. We are a non-governmental and not-for-profit organization, funded through membership fees and revenues from contract management services and publications. Our mandate is to facilitate the development of public policy on higher education and to encourage cooperation among universities and governments, industry, communities, and institutions in other countries. We provide services to member universities in three main areas: public policy and advocacy; communication, research and information-sharing; and scholarships and international programs.
Paul Davidson, President
Date de la fin du dernier exercice financier complet : 2009-03-31
Institution gouvernementale | Financement reçu au cours du dernier exercice financier | Financement attendu pendant l'exercice financier en cours |
---|---|---|
Affaires étrangères et Commerce international Canada (MAECIC) | 10 000,00 $ | Non |
Affaires étrangères et Commerce international Canada (MAECIC) | 19 524,00 $ | Non |
Affaires étrangères et Commerce international Canada (MAECIC) | 4 305,00 $ | Non |
Affaires étrangères et Commerce international Canada (MAECIC) | 31 640,00 $ | Oui |
Agence canadienne de développement international (ACDI) | 1 597 719,00 $ | Oui |
Agence canadienne de développement international (ACDI) | 4 591 704,00 $ | Oui |
Défense nationale (MDN) | 374 500,00 $ | Oui |
International Development Research Centre | 92 485,00 $ | Oui |
International Development Research Centre | 101 759,00 $ | Oui |
Patrimoine canadien (PCH) | 8 240,00 $ | Oui |
Ressources humaines et Développement social Canada (RHDSC) | 63 980,00 $ | Non |
Sécurité publique Canada (SP) | 3 360,00 $ | Oui |
Adresse :
350 Albert Street, Suite 600
Ottawa, ON K1R 1B1
Canada
Numéro de téléphone :
613-563-1236
Poste
232
Numéro de fax :
613-563-9745
Ceci est le nom de l'agent responsable tel qu'indiqué dans l'enregistrement le plus récent de l'entreprise ou de l'organisation.
Nom | De | à |
---|---|---|
Universities Canada/Universités Canada | 2024-03-18 | actuel |
Universities Canada/Universités Canada | 2015-04-22 | 2024-03-18 |
Association of Universities and Colleges of Canada/Association des universités et collèges du Canada | 2008-08-15 | 2015-04-22 |
Nom de l'agent responsable | De (aaaa-mm-jj) | À (aaaa-mm-jj) |
---|---|---|
Gabriel Miller | 2024-03-18 | Actuel |
Philip Landon | 2023-07-01 | 2024-03-18 |
Paul Davidson | 2009-05-11 | 2023-07-01 |
CLAIRE M. MORRIS | 2005-06-07 | 2009-05-11 |
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Communications Advisor
Natural Sciences and Engineering Research Council, Public Affairs, External Relations and Communications Division |
septembre 2008 à août 2009 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Manager, International Relations
Natural Resources Canada, Mining and Mineral Sciences Laboratories |
février 2001 à février 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Research and Policy Analyst, Stategic Policy and Planning
Health Canada, First Nation and Inuit Health Branch |
août 2004 à novembre 2004 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Press Secretary
House of Commons, Office of the Leader, New Democratic Party |
octobre 1984 à décembre 1990 | Pas une charge désignée |
Project Officer
Energy, Mines and Resources Canada, Energy Conservation Information Centres |
octobre 1978 à décembre 1979 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Senior Analyst
Department of the Secretary of State of Canada, Education Support Branch |
1983 à 1988 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Economist/Statistician (ES)
Transport Canada, Intelligent Transportation Systems Policy Branch |
avril 2003 à octobre 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |
Commerce Officer (CO)
Industry Canada, Federal-provincial Relations Division |
août 2002 à mai 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Director of Parliamentary Affairs
Natural Resources Canada, Office of the Minister |
novembre 2005 à janvier 2006 | Pas une charge désignée |
Senior Policy Advisor and Director of Parliamentary Affairs
Minister of State (Public Health), Health Canada, Office of the Minister of State |
décembre 2003 à novembre 2005 | Pas une charge désignée |
Executive Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Carolyn Bennett, MP St. Paul's Ontario |
février 2002 à décembre 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |
Policy Analyst
Health Canada, Policy Development Division, Health Promotions Branch |
janvier 1998 à décembre 1998 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Temporary administrative assistant
Elections Canada, Election unit |
juin 2004 à juin 2004 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Assistant Deputy Minister
Human Resources and Skills Development Canada/Service Canada, Policy, Partnerships and Corporate Affairs |
septembre 2007 à novembre 2008 | novembre 28, 2008 Note 2 |
Acting Assistant Deputy Minister
Privy Council Office, Intergovernmental Operations |
2006 à octobre 2007 | Pas une charge désignée |
Director General, Sectoral Analysis
Privy Council Office, Intergovernmental Operations |
2002 à 2006 | Pas une charge désignée |
Assistant Director General, Food Directorate
Health Canada, Health Products and Food Branch |
2000 à 2002 | Pas une charge désignée |
Senior Director, Technical Barriers and Regulations
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Trade Policy Bureau |
1998 à 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
Senior Advisor
Privy Council Office, Economic and Regional Development Policy Secretariat |
1993 à 1998 | Pas une charge désignée |
Senior Advisor
Federal-Provincial Relations Office, Social and Economic Policy Secretariat |
1991 à 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Senior Policy Analyst
Supply and Services Canada, Corporate Policy and Planning Branch |
1989 à 1991 | Pas une charge désignée |
Executive Assistant to the Deputy Minister
Supply and Services Canada, Office of the Deputy Minister |
1987 à 1989 | Pas une charge désignée |
Senior Analyst
Department of Fisheries and Oceans, Atlantic Fisheries |
1983 à 1987 | Pas une charge désignée |
Marketing Officer
Export Development Corporation, Marketing Services |
1982 à 1983 | Pas une charge désignée |
Project Manager
Canadian Unity Information Office, Research and Analysis Division |
1977 à 1982 | Pas une charge désignée |
Information Officer
Manpower and Immigration Canada, Informaton Services |
1974 à 1977 | Pas une charge désignée |
Information Officer
Unemployment Insurance Commission, Information Services |
juin 1973 à septembre 1973 | Pas une charge désignée |
Writer
Labour Canada, The National Gazette |
juin 1972 à septembre 1972 | Pas une charge désignée |