Universities Canada has represented Canada's universities since 1911. We are the voice of Canada's universities. Our advocacy ensures that higher education is recognized as vital to Canada's prosperity and quality of life as a knowledge-based society and economy. We are a non-governmental and not-for-profit organization, funded through membership fees and revenues from contract management services and publications. Our mandate is to facilitate the development of public policy on higher education and to encourage cooperation among universities and governments, industry, communities, and institutions in other countries. We provide services to member universities in three main areas: public policy and advocacy; communication, research and information-sharing; and scholarships and international programs.
Paul Davidson, President
Date de la fin du dernier exercice financier complet : 2017-03-31
Institution gouvernementale | Financement reçu au cours du dernier exercice financier | Financement attendu pendant l'exercice financier en cours |
---|---|---|
Patrimoine canadien (PCH) | 23 511,00 $ | Oui |
Adresse :
350 Albert Street, Suite 1710
Ottawa, ON K1R 1B1
Canada
Numéro de téléphone :
613-563-1236
Poste
232
Numéro de fax :
613-563-9745
Ceci est le nom de l'agent responsable tel qu'indiqué dans l'enregistrement le plus récent de l'entreprise ou de l'organisation.
Nom | De | à |
---|---|---|
Universities Canada/Universités Canada | 2024-03-18 | actuel |
Universities Canada/Universités Canada | 2015-04-22 | 2024-03-18 |
Association of Universities and Colleges of Canada/Association des universités et collèges du Canada | 2008-08-15 | 2015-04-22 |
Nom de l'agent responsable | De (aaaa-mm-jj) | À (aaaa-mm-jj) |
---|---|---|
Gabriel Miller | 2024-03-18 | Actuel |
Philip Landon | 2023-07-01 | 2024-03-18 |
Paul Davidson | 2009-05-11 | 2023-07-01 |
CLAIRE M. MORRIS | 2005-06-07 | 2009-05-11 |
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Member's Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the Member for Ville-Marie—Le Sud-Ouest—Île-des-Sœurs |
septembre 2017 à février 2018 | Pas une charge désignée |
Junior Analyst
Indigenous and Northern Affairs Canada, Intergovernmental and International Affairs Directorate |
février 2016 à décembre 2016 | Pas une charge désignée |
Program Assistant
Employment and Social Development Canada, Communications Unit, Temporary Foreign Worker Program |
octobre 2015 à décembre 2015 | Pas une charge désignée |
Inspector
Department of National Defence, Quality Control |
juin 2015 à août 2015 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Senior Research Analyst
Aboriginal Affairs and Northern Development Canada, Resolution and Individual Affairs |
octobre 2010 à novembre 2011 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Senior Policy Analyst
Citizenship and Immigration Canada, Strategic Policy Branch |
2006 à août 2011 | Pas une charge désignée |
Policy Analyst
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Youth Mobility and Academic Relations |
2004 à 2006 | Pas une charge désignée |
Junior Policy Analyst/Policy Analyst
Human Resources and Skills Development Canada, Canada Student Loans Program |
2002 à 2004 | Pas une charge désignée |
Junior Communications Officer
Canadian Food Inspection Agency, Communications Branch |
2001 à 2001 | Pas une charge désignée |
Page
House of Commons, House of Commons |
1999 à 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Policy Analyst
Human Resources and Social Development Canada (HRSDC), Learning Policy Directorate / Intergovernmental Relations Directorate |
septembre 2012 à mai 2017 | Pas une charge désignée |
Policy Analyst
Canada School of the Public Service, Innovation in Public Management Branch |
mai 2006 à mai 2007 | Pas une charge désignée |
Policy Analyst
Health Canada, Deputy Ministers's Office / Department Secretariat Division - Admin Services |
janvier 2000 à mai 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
Policy Analyst
Health Canada, Senior Assistant Deputy Minister's Office / corporate Service Branch - Admin Ser |
décembre 1994 à novembre 1995 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Parliamentary Intern in the House of Commons through the Parliamentary Internship Programme
House of Commons, House of Commons |
septembre 2013 à juin 2014 | Pas une charge désignée |
Tour Guide with the National Capital Commission
National Capital Commission, National Capital Commission |
mai 2011 à septembre 2011 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Member's Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the Member for Ville-Marie—Le Sud-Ouest—Île-des-Sœurs |
septembre 2017 à février 2018 | Pas une charge désignée |
Junior Analyst
Indigenous and Northern Affairs Canada, Intergovernmental and International Affairs Directorate |
février 2016 à décembre 2016 | Pas une charge désignée |
Program Assistant
Employment and Social Development Canada, Communications Unit, Temporary Foreign Worker Program |
octobre 2015 à décembre 2015 | Pas une charge désignée |
Inspector
Department of National Defence, Quality Control |
juin 2015 à août 2015 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Program Officer
Canadian International Development Agency, Canadian Partnership Branch |
mai 2002 à mai 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |
Full-time consultant
Canadian International Development Agency, Canadian Partnership Branch |
mars 2002 à avril 2002 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Policy Analyst
Social Sciences and Humanities Research Council, Corporate Strategy and Performance |
octobre 2010 à décembre 2015 | Pas une charge désignée |
Policy Analyst
Environment Canada, Multilateral and Bilateral Affairs, International Affairs Branch |
juin 2009 à septembre 2009 | Pas une charge désignée |
Administrative Assistant
Environment Canada, Assistant Deputy Minister’s Office, International Affairs Branch |
octobre 2006 à janvier 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
Administrative Assistant
Environment Canada, Greenhouse Gas Reductions Directorate, Environmental Stewardship Branch |
novembre 2005 à octobre 2006 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Administrative Assistant
House of Commons, House of Commons |
avril 2006 à janvier 2007 | Pas une charge désignée |
Member's Assistant
House of Commons, House of Commons |
septembre 2005 à mars 2006 | Pas une charge désignée |