The Association of Universities and Colleges of Canada has represented Canada's universities since 1911. We are the voice of Canada's universities. Our advocacy ensures that higher education is recognized as vital to Canada's prosperity and quality of life as a knowledge-based society and economy. We are a non-governmental and not-for-profit organization, funded through membership fees and revenues from contract management services and publications. Our mandate is to facilitate the development of public policy on higher education and to encourage cooperation among universities and governments, industry, communities, and institutions in other countries. We provide services to member universities in three main areas: public policy and advocacy; communication, research and information-sharing; and scholarships and international programs.
Paul Davidson, President
End date of the last completed financial year: 2010-03-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Canadian Heritage (PCH) | $8,240.00 | Yes |
Canadian International Development Agency (CIDA) | $4,591,704.00 | Yes |
Canadian International Development Agency (CIDA) | $1,597,719.00 | Yes |
Foreign Affairs and International Trade Canada (DFAITC) | $19,524.00 | No |
Foreign Affairs and International Trade Canada (DFAITC) | $10,000.00 | No |
Foreign Affairs and International Trade Canada (DFAITC) | $31,640.00 | Yes |
Foreign Affairs and International Trade Canada (DFAITC) | $4,305.00 | No |
Human Resources and Social Development Canada (HRSDC) | $63,980.00 | No |
International Development Research Centre | $92,485.00 | Yes |
International Development Research Centre | $101,759.00 | Yes |
National Defence (DND) | $374,500.00 | Yes |
Public Safety Canada (PS) | $3,360.00 | Yes |
Address:
350 Albert Street, Suite 600
Ottawa, ON K1R 1B1
Canada
Telephone number:
613-563-1236
Ext.
232
Fax number:
613-563-9745
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Universities Canada/Universités Canada | 2024-03-18 | current |
Universities Canada/Universités Canada | 2015-04-22 | 2024-03-18 |
Association of Universities and Colleges of Canada/Association des universités et collèges du Canada | 2008-08-15 | 2015-04-22 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Gabriel Miller | 2024-03-18 | Current |
Philip Landon | 2023-07-01 | 2024-03-18 |
Paul Davidson | 2009-05-11 | 2023-07-01 |
CLAIRE M. MORRIS | 2005-06-07 | 2009-05-11 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Intern
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Parliamentary Centre, Youth International Internship Program |
November 1997 to March 1998 | Not a designated office |
Intern
Indian and Northern Affairs Canada, Circumpolar Liaison Directorate |
January 1997 to March 1997 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Permanent Mission of Canada to the United Nations: New York, New York |
June 1985 to August 1985 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Manager, International Relations
Natural Resources Canada, Mining and Mineral Sciences Laboratories |
February 2001 to February 2003 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Commercial Officer, Educaiton Marketing Group
Foreign Affairs and International Trade Canada, Trade Section |
January 2005 to October 2005 | Not a designated office |
Special Projects Officer, Southeast Asia Division
Foreign Affairs and International Trade Canada, Trade Section |
June 2004 to January 2005 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Communications Advisor
Natural Sciences and Engineering Research Council, Public Affairs, External Relations and Communications Division |
September 2008 to August 2009 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Research and Policy Analyst, Stategic Policy and Planning
Health Canada, First Nation and Inuit Health Branch |
August 2004 to November 2004 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Assistant Deputy Minister
Human Resources and Skills Development Canada/Service Canada, Policy, Partnerships and Corporate Affairs |
September 2007 to November 2008 | November 28, 2008 Footnote 2 |
Acting Assistant Deputy Minister
Privy Council Office, Intergovernmental Operations |
2006 to October 2007 | Not a designated office |
Director General, Sectoral Analysis
Privy Council Office, Intergovernmental Operations |
2002 to 2006 | Not a designated office |
Assistant Director General, Food Directorate
Health Canada, Health Products and Food Branch |
2000 to 2002 | Not a designated office |
Senior Director, Technical Barriers and Regulations
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Trade Policy Bureau |
1998 to 2000 | Not a designated office |
Senior Advisor
Privy Council Office, Economic and Regional Development Policy Secretariat |
1993 to 1998 | Not a designated office |
Senior Advisor
Federal-Provincial Relations Office, Social and Economic Policy Secretariat |
1991 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Senior Policy Analyst
Supply and Services Canada, Corporate Policy and Planning Branch |
1989 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant to the Deputy Minister
Supply and Services Canada, Office of the Deputy Minister |
1987 to 1989 | Not a designated office |
Senior Analyst
Department of Fisheries and Oceans, Atlantic Fisheries |
1983 to 1987 | Not a designated office |
Marketing Officer
Export Development Corporation, Marketing Services |
1982 to 1983 | Not a designated office |
Project Manager
Canadian Unity Information Office, Research and Analysis Division |
1977 to 1982 | Not a designated office |
Information Officer
Manpower and Immigration Canada, Informaton Services |
1974 to 1977 | Not a designated office |
Information Officer
Unemployment Insurance Commission, Information Services |
June 1973 to September 1973 | Not a designated office |
Writer
Labour Canada, The National Gazette |
June 1972 to September 1972 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Temporary administrative assistant
Elections Canada, Election unit |
June 2004 to June 2004 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Analyst
Department of the Secretary of State of Canada, Education Support Branch |
1983 to 1988 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Economist/Statistician (ES)
Transport Canada, Intelligent Transportation Systems Policy Branch |
April 2003 to October 2003 | Not a designated office |
Commerce Officer (CO)
Industry Canada, Federal-provincial Relations Division |
August 2002 to May 2003 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Intern
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Parliamentary Centre, Youth International Internship Program |
November 1997 to March 1998 | Not a designated office |
Intern
Indian and Northern Affairs Canada, Circumpolar Liaison Directorate |
January 1997 to March 1997 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Permanent Mission of Canada to the United Nations: New York, New York |
June 1985 to August 1985 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Parliamentary Affairs
Natural Resources Canada, Office of the Minister |
November 2005 to January 2006 | Not a designated office |
Senior Policy Advisor and Director of Parliamentary Affairs
Minister of State (Public Health), Health Canada, Office of the Minister of State |
December 2003 to November 2005 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Carolyn Bennett, MP St. Paul's Ontario |
February 2002 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
Health Canada, Policy Development Division, Health Promotions Branch |
January 1998 to December 1998 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Press Secretary
House of Commons, Office of the Leader, New Democratic Party |
October 1984 to December 1990 | Not a designated office |
Project Officer
Energy, Mines and Resources Canada, Energy Conservation Information Centres |
October 1978 to December 1979 | Not a designated office |