Universities Canada has represented Canada's universities since 1911. We are the voice of Canada's universities. Our advocacy ensures that higher education is recognized as vital to Canada's prosperity and quality of life as a knowledge-based society and economy. We are a non-governmental and not-for-profit organization, funded through membership fees and revenues from contract management services and publications. Our mandate is to facilitate the development of public policy on higher education and to encourage cooperation among universities and governments, industry, communities, and institutions in other countries. We provide services to member universities in three main areas: public policy and advocacy; communication, research and information-sharing; and scholarships and international programs.
Paul Davidson, President
End date of the last completed financial year: 2014-03-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Canadian Heritage (PCH) | $23,088.00 | Yes |
Foreign Affairs, Trade and Development Canada | $927,047.00 | Yes |
International Development Research Centre (IDRC) | $899,741.00 | Yes |
National Defence (DND) | $10,000,000.00 | No |
Address:
350 Albert Street, Suite 1710
Ottawa, ON K1R 1B1
Canada
Telephone number:
613-563-1236
Ext.
232
Fax number:
613-563-9745
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Universities Canada/Universités Canada | 2024-03-18 | current |
Universities Canada/Universités Canada | 2015-04-22 | 2024-03-18 |
Association of Universities and Colleges of Canada/Association des universités et collèges du Canada | 2008-08-15 | 2015-04-22 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Gabriel Miller | 2024-03-18 | Current |
Philip Landon | 2023-07-01 | 2024-03-18 |
Paul Davidson | 2009-05-11 | 2023-07-01 |
CLAIRE M. MORRIS | 2005-06-07 | 2009-05-11 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Parliamentary Affairs
Natural Resources Canada, Office of the Minister |
November 2005 to January 2006 | Not a designated office |
Senior Policy Advisor and Director of Parliamentary Affairs
Minister of State (Public Health), Health Canada, Office of the Minister of State |
December 2003 to November 2005 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Carolyn Bennett, MP St. Paul's Ontario |
February 2002 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
Health Canada, Policy Development Division, Health Promotions Branch |
January 1998 to December 1998 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Policy Analyst
Citizenship and Immigration Canada, Strategic Policy Branch |
2006 Footnote 3 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Youth Mobility and Academic Relations |
2004 to 2006 | Not a designated office |
Junior Policy Analyst/Policy Analyst
Human Resources and Skills Development Canada, Canada Student Loans Program |
2002 to 2004 | Not a designated office |
Junior Communications Officer
Canadian Food Inspection Agency, Communications Branch |
2001 to 2001 | Not a designated office |
Page
House of Commons, House of Commons |
1999 to 2000 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Border Guard
Canada Border Services Agency, Border Services |
1996 to 1999 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Research Analyst
Aboriginal Affairs and Northern Development Canada, Resolution and Individual Affairs |
October 2010 to November 2011 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Manager, International Relations
Natural Resources Canada, Mining and Mineral Sciences Laboratories |
February 2001 to February 2003 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Administrative Assistant
Privy Council Office, Provincial/Territorial Analysis |
May 2011 to August 2012 | Not a designated office |
Student
Privy Council Office, Intergovernmental Policy |
April 2008 to April 2011 | Not a designated office |
Student
Service Canada, Citizen Services Branch |
January 2008 to April 2008 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Analyst
Department of the Secretary of State of Canada, Education Support Branch |
1983 to 1988 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Administrative Assistant
House of Commons, House of Commons |
April 2006 to January 2007 | Not a designated office |
Member's Assistant
House of Commons, House of Commons |
September 2005 to March 2006 | Not a designated office |