Universities Canada has represented Canada's universities since 1911. We are the voice of Canada's universities. Our advocacy ensures that higher education is recognized as vital to Canada's prosperity and quality of life as a knowledge-based society and economy. We are a non-governmental and not-for-profit organization, funded through membership fees and revenues from contract management services and publications. Our mandate is to facilitate the development of public policy on higher education and to encourage cooperation among universities and governments, industry, communities, and institutions in other countries. We provide services to member universities in three main areas: public policy and advocacy; communication, research and information-sharing; and scholarships and international programs.
Paul Davidson, President
End date of the last completed financial year: 2020-03-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Canadian Heritage (PCH) | $24,533.00 | Yes |
Employment and Social Development Canada (ESDC) | $99,500.00 | No |
Address:
350 Albert Street, Suite 1710
Ottawa, ON K1R 1B1
Canada
Telephone number:
613-563-1236
Ext.
232
Fax number:
613-563-9745
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Universities Canada/Universités Canada | 2024-03-18 | current |
Universities Canada/Universités Canada | 2015-04-22 | 2024-03-18 |
Association of Universities and Colleges of Canada/Association des universités et collèges du Canada | 2008-08-15 | 2015-04-22 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Gabriel Miller | 2024-03-18 | Current |
Philip Landon | 2023-07-01 | 2024-03-18 |
Paul Davidson | 2009-05-11 | 2023-07-01 |
CLAIRE M. MORRIS | 2005-06-07 | 2009-05-11 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Research Intern
Global Affairs Canada, Science and Technology Policy Office, Embassy of Canada to the United States |
January 2012 to April 2012 | Not a designated office |
Student Guide
Veterans Affairs Canada, Canadian National Vimy Memorial |
January 2011 to May 2011 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Research Analyst
Aboriginal Affairs and Northern Development Canada, Resolution and Individual Affairs |
October 2010 to November 2011 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
FSWEP Student
Global Affairs Canada, Development Policy Research |
January 2017 to April 2017 | Not a designated office |
Deputy Press Secretary/Press Secretary
Public Safety Canada, Office of the Minister of Public Safety |
April 2015 to November 2015 | November 4, 2015 |
Special Assistant Parliamentary Affairs
Public Safety Canada, Office of the Minister of Public Safety |
September 2014 to April 2015 | April 30, 2015 |
Intern
Public Safety Canada, Office of the Minister of Public Safety |
May 2014 to August 2014 | August 29, 2014 |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Evaluation Intern
Crown Indigenous Relations and Northern Affairs Canada, Evaluation, Performance Measurement and Review Branch (EPMRB) |
May 2018 to August 2018 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Junior Policy Analyst
Environment and Climate Change Canada, Meteorological Service |
February 2019 to June 2019 | Not a designated office |
Program Assistant
Crown-Indigenous Relations and Northern Affairs Canada, Northern Affairs Office |
September 2017 to December 2017 | Not a designated office |
Junior Environmental Officer
Environment and Climate Change Canada, Environmental Protection Branch |
May 2017 to August 2017 | Not a designated office |
Youth Engagement Assistant
Environment and Climate Change Canada, Meteorological Service of Canada |
January 2017 to May 2017 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Analyst
Immigration, Refugees and Citizenship Canada, Strategic and Program Policy Branch |
April 2017 to June 2017 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
Health Canada, Strategic Policy Branch |
January 2016 to April 2017 | Not a designated office |
Junior Analyst
Asia Pacific, Global Affairs Canada |
May 2015 to August 2015 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Media Analyst
Health Canada, Communications and Public Affairs Branch |
February 2015 to March 2016 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Research Intern
Global Affairs Canada, Science and Technology Policy Office, Embassy of Canada to the United States |
January 2012 to April 2012 | Not a designated office |
Student Guide
Veterans Affairs Canada, Canadian National Vimy Memorial |
January 2011 to May 2011 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Analyst
Social Sciences and Humanities Research Council, Corporate Strategy and Performance |
October 2010 to December 2015 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
Environment Canada, Multilateral and Bilateral Affairs, International Affairs Branch |
June 2009 to September 2009 | Not a designated office |
Administrative Assistant
Environment Canada, Assistant Deputy Minister’s Office, International Affairs Branch |
October 2006 to January 2008 | Not a designated office |
Administrative Assistant
Environment Canada, Greenhouse Gas Reductions Directorate, Environmental Stewardship Branch |
November 2005 to October 2006 | Not a designated office |