NAV CANADA was incorporated on May 26, 1995 as a not-for-profit corporation under the Canada Corporations Act. The objectives of the company are to acquire, own, manage, operate and develop the Canadian air navigation system and services in and over Canada and in such international airspace the responsibility for which has been delegated to Canada pursuant to international agreement. Under the Civil Air Navigation Services Commercialization Act, the company has been granted the exclusive right and obligation to provide civil air traffic control, civil aeronautical information and specified flight information.
JOHN CRICHTON, PRESIDENT & CHIEF EXECUTIVE OFFICER
End date of the last completed financial year: 2007-08-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Human Resources and Social Development Canada (HRSDC) | $0.00 | Yes |
Address:
77 Metcalfe Street
Ottawa, ON K1P 5L6
Canada
Telephone number:
613-563-7000
Fax number:
613-563-3487
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
NAV CANADA | 2024-05-01 | current |
NAV CANADA | 2008-07-09 | 2024-05-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Raymond Bohn | 2021-01-01 | Current |
Neil Wilson | 2016-01-01 | 2021-01-01 |
JOHN CRICHTON | 1998-08-17 | 2016-01-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
General Manager Flight Information Region Operations
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1992 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Superintendent Tower Operations
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1990 to 1992 | Not a designated office |
Manager, Toronto Control Tower
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1988 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
Manager, Air Traffic Control Training School
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1984 to 1988 | Not a designated office |
Instrument Flight Rules/Visual Flight Rules Instructor
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1981 to 1984 | Not a designated office |
IFR Controller
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1975 to 1981 | Not a designated office |
VFR Controller
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1973 to 1974 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Material Management
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services Transfer Team |
July 1996 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Manager, Area Control Centre Training
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1993 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Acting Training Supervisor
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1991 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Instrument Flight Rules Course Director
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1990 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Instrument Flight Rules Instructor
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1989 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
Air Traffic Controller Training
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1984 to 1984 | Not a designated office |
Instrument Flight Rules Air Traffic Controller
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1984 to 1989 | Not a designated office |
Control Tower Controller
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1983 to 1983 | Not a designated office |
Air Traffic Controller in Training
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1982 to 1982 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Air Traffic Controller
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1989 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Air Traffic Controller
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1982 to 1985 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant, Parliamentary Affairs
Minister of Justice, Parliamentary Affairs |
January 2004 to March 2006 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Manager, Winnipeg Regional Air Traffic Services School
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1994 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Course Director, Winnipeg Regional Air Traffic Services School
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1985 to 1994 | Not a designated office |
Instructor, Winnipeg Regional Air Traffic Services School
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1983 to 1985 | Not a designated office |
Instrument Flight Rules Air Traffic Controller
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1980 to 1983 | Not a designated office |
Licensed Visual Flight Rules Specialist
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1977 to 1980 | Not a designated office |
Operations Support Specialist
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1973 to 1977 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Electronic Technologist, Gander, NL
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1980 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Communications Engineer, Technical Services Department
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1974 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Shift Manager
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1993 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Unit Training Manager
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1992 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Airt Traffic Controller
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1972 to 1992 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Air Traffic Controller Supervisor
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1994 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Air Traffic Controller
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1989 to 1994 | Not a designated office |
Air Traffic Control Officer, Canadian Forces Base Trenton
Department of National Defence, Air Navigation Services |
1983 to 1989 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Technical Services Area Manager, Ottawa Airport
Transport Canada, Aviaton Technical Services |
1991 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Maintenance Requirement Specialist
Transport Canada, Aviation Technical Services |
1987 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Electronics Technologist
Transport Canada, Aviation Technical Services |
1977 to 1987 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Air Traffic Controller
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1993 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Flight Service Specialist
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1988 to 1992 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Operational Requirements Specialist
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1988 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
Senior Operations Specialist
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1988 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Manager Area Control Centre Operations
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1991 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Chief, Quebec Units
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1989 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Manager of Software
Correctional Services, No Branch or Unit |
1983 to 1984 | Not a designated office |
Project Manager
Transport Canada, Facilties, Equipment, Systems Department |
1980 to 1982 | Not a designated office |
Software Engineer
Transport Canada, Facilities, Equipment, Systems Department |
1974 to 1979 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Manager, Area Control Centre Operations, Moncton Area Control Centre
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1995 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Shift Manager, Moncton Area Control Centre
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1992 to 1995 | Not a designated office |
Regional Instrument Flight Rules Specialist, Moncton Area Control Centre
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1991 to 1992 | Not a designated office |
Air Traffic Controller, Moncton Area Control Centre
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1988 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Manager, Goose Bay Tower
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1983 to 1988 | Not a designated office |
Air Traffic Controller
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1973 to 1983 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Air Advisor Canadian Defence Liaison Staff, London, England
Department of National Defence, Canadian Forces |
1992 to 1996 | Not a designated office |
Director of Safety
Department of National Defence, Canadian Forces |
1988 to 1992 | Not a designated office |
Base Commander, Goose Bay
Department of National Defence, Canadian Forces |
1984 to 1988 | Not a designated office |
Officer of Canadian Forces
Department of National Defence, Canadian Forces |
1965 to 1984 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Procedure Specialist (Ottawa)
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1995 to 2000 | Not a designated office |
Procedure Specialist (Moncton)
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1992 to 1995 | Not a designated office |
Air Traffic Controller
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1992 to 1992 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Air Traffic Controller Shift Manager
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1992 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Air Traffic Controller Supervisor
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1985 to 1992 | Not a designated office |
Air Traffic Controller
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1979 to 1985 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief
Transport Canada, Air Economic Evaluations Branch |
1995 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Chief, Surface
Transport Canada, Crown Corporations & Subsidies |
1991 to 1995 | Not a designated office |
Economic Analyst
Transport Canada, Air Economic Evaluation Branch |
1990 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Analyst, User Impact
Transport Canada, Cost Recovery Branch |
1987 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
Economic Analyst
Transport Canada, Air Economic Evaluation Branch |
1982 to 1986 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
National Superintendent of Technical Operations, Management Divisions
Transport Canada, Technical Services Branch |
1995 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Operations Manager, Air Navigation Services Integrated Maintenance System
Transport Canada, Technical Services Branch |
1990 to 1995 | Not a designated office |
Technical Service Area Manager, Maintenance Management Division, Ontario Region
Transport Canada, Technical Services Branch |
1986 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
Area Maintenance Manager, Electronics Maintenance Centre North, Ontario Region
Transport Canada, Technical Services Branch |
1985 to 1986 | Not a designated office |
Electronics Maintenance Manager, Timmins Workcentre, Ontario Region
Transport Canada, Technical Services Branch |
1979 to 1985 | Not a designated office |
Electronics Maintenance Supervisor, North Bay Workcentre, Electronics Maintenance Centre North, Ontario Region
Transport Canada, Technical Services Branch |
1974 to 1979 | Not a designated office |
Electronic Systems Technician, Ontario Region
Transport Canada, Technical Services Branch |
1967 to 1974 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Coop Student
Transport Canada, Finance Department, Economic Evaluation Branch |
1994 to 1994 | Not a designated office |
Analyst
Transport Canada, Finance Department, Financial Planning Branch |
1994 to 1997 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Acting Chief - Research Analysis and Special Programs Division
Transport Canada, Transportation Development Centre |
1997 to 1997 | Not a designated office |
Senior Ergonomist/Scientific Advisor/Project Manager
Transport Canada, Transportation Development Centre |
September 1992 to 1997 | Not a designated office |
Ergonomist/Scientific Advisor/Inspector
Atomic Energy Control Board, No Branch or Unit |
October 1990 to August 1992 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Acting Program Manager, Canadian Automated Air Traffic System Technical Training Specialist
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1996 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Canadian Automated Air Traffic System Technical Sytem Instructor
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1994 to 1996 | Not a designated office |
Electronics System Instructor
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1992 to 1994 | Not a designated office |
Electronic System Analyst
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1988 to 1992 | Not a designated office |
Electronic System Technician
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1981 to 1988 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Consultant
Natural Resources Canada, No Branch or Unit |
1968 to 1968 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Project Manager, George A. Scott Centre, Cornwall Training Institute
Transport Canada, Technical Services Branch |
1994 to 2004 | Not a designated office |
Electronic System Instructor, Cornwall Training Institute
Transport Canada, Technical Services Branch |
1989 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Electronic Instructor and Technician
Transport Canada, Technical Services Branch |
1987 to 1989 | Not a designated office |
Electronic Technician, Timmins Airport
Transport Canada, Technical Services Branch |
1983 to 1987 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Procedures Specialist
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1996 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Technical Training Specialist
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1991 to 1996 | Not a designated office |
Instrument Flight Rules Controller
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1980 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Manager, Information Management
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services (Transport Canada Training Institute) |
October 1995 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Manager, Technology Support
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
October 1994 to October 1995 | Not a designated office |
Electronic Maintenance and Installation Technician
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
December 1990 to September 1992 | Not a designated office |
Electronic System Technician
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1985 to December 1990 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Team Supervisor,, Maintenance Services
Transport Canada, Aviation Technical Services |
July 1995 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Team Supervisor, Engineering Services
Transport Canada, Aviation Technical Services |
1977 to June 1995 | Not a designated office |
Technologist, Maintenance Services
Transport Canada, Aviation Technical Services |
1974 to 1977 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Supervisor
Transport Canada, Aviation Weather Services Branch |
1988 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Civil Aviation Inspector
Transport Canada, Airspace Branch (ANSR) |
1987 to 1988 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Summer Student
Public Service Commission, Financial Services Directorate |
May 1985 to August 1985 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student
Public Services Commission, Financial Services Directorate |
May 1984 to August 1984 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Shift Manager
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1993 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Terminal Supervisor
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1991 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Standards Officer
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1988 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Terminal Controller
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1980 to 1988 | Not a designated office |
Tower Controller
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1974 to 1980 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant
Office of the Minister of Health, Health Canada |
January 1996 to January 1997 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Office of the Minister of Public Works and Government Special Services, Publics Work and Goverment Services Canada |
January 1994 to January 1996 | Not a designated office |
Research Officer
Privy Council Office, Machinery of Goverment Secretariat |
June 1992 to November 1994 | Not a designated office |
Student Employment Officer
Canada Employment Centre, Manpower Canada |
May 1989 to August 1989 | Not a designated office |
Student Employment Officer
Canada Employment Centre, Manpower Canada |
May 1988 to August 1988 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Procurement Officer
Department of Supply and Services, Procurement Office |
June 1977 to September 1981 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Engineering Implementation Manager
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1995 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Regional Superintendent Engineering Services, Ontario
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1990 to 1995 | Not a designated office |
Regional Radar Modernization Project Duty Manager
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1988 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
Regional Engineering Supervisor
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1983 to 1988 | Not a designated office |
Engineer-in-Charge Terminal Services
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1978 to 1983 | Not a designated office |
Terminal Services Engineer
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1977 to 1978 | Not a designated office |
Electronic Systems Engineer
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1973 to 1977 | Not a designated office |
Maintenance Technologist
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1970 to 1970 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Civil Aviation Inspector, Air Navigation System Requirements
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1987 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Shift Manager
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1993 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Terminal Supervisor
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1991 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Standards Officer
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1988 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Terminal Controller
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1980 to 1988 | Not a designated office |
Tower Controller
Transport Canada, Air Navigation Services |
1974 to 1980 | Not a designated office |