NATIONAL TRADE ASSOCIATION OF FEDERALLY INSPECTED MEAT PACKERS/ PROCESSORS. Canadian Meat Council SERVES AS A VEHICLE TO EXPRESS THE COLLECTIVE VIEWS OF THE MEMBERSHIP AND TO SPEAK FOR THE MEAT PACKING/ PROCESSING INDUSTRY IN CANADA AND TO CONTRIBUTE TO THE COMPETITIVENESS OF THE INDUSTRY DOMESTICALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY.
Christopher White, President and CEO
End date of the last completed financial year: 2017-12-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada (AAFC) | $59,787.05 | Yes |
Address:
220 Laurier Avenue West
Suite 930
Ottawa, ON K1P 5Z9
Canada
Telephone number:
613-729-3911
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Canadian Meat Council/Conseil des Viandes du Canada | 2024-05-14 | current |
Canadian Meat Council/Conseil des Viandes du Canada | 2008-08-07 | 2024-05-14 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Christopher White | 2017-03-13 | Current |
Jim Laws | 2005-07-22 | 2017-03-13 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Trade Policy Officer
Agriculture Canada, Market and Industry Services Branch |
August 2016 to August 2017 | Not a designated office |
Trade Commisioner/Agri-Food Councillor
Agriculture Canada, Canadian Embassy, Mexico |
August 2011 to July 2016 | Not a designated office |
Trade Commisioner/Agri-Food Consul
Agriculture Canada, Canadian Consulate General, Denver, CO, USA |
August 2006 to August 2011 | Not a designated office |
Special Advisor, Trade Advocacy
Agriculture Canada, Market and Industry Services Branch |
August 2004 to August 2006 | Not a designated office |
Trade Commisioner/Agri-Food Councillor
Foreign Affairs/International Trade, Canadian Embassy, Mexico |
August 1999 to August 2004 | Not a designated office |
Mexico Desk Officer, Agri-Food
Foreign Affairs/International Trade, Canadian Embassy, Mexico |
August 1996 to August 1999 | Not a designated office |
Market Development Officer
Agriculture Canada, Market and Industry Services Branch |
1993 to August 1996 | Not a designated office |
Special/Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Hon. Bill McKnight, PC, MP |
1990 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
House of Commons, Murray Cardiff, MP |
1984 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
Assistant to Chief of Staff
House of Commons, Hon. Paul Cosgrove, PC, MP |
1983 to 1984 | Not a designated office |
Member's Assistant
House of Commons, Doug Frith, MP |
1980 to 1983 | Not a designated office |
Member's Assistant
House of Commons, Hon. Jim Jerome, MP (Speaker) |
1975 to 1980 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Member's Assistant
House of Commons, Michael Cooper, MP |
May 2016 to October 2017 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor
Department of Heritage, Minister's Office |
May 2015 to August 2015 | August 21, 2015 |
Constituency Assistant
House of Commons, Bruce Stanton, MP |
June 2012 to September 2012 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief of Staff
Department of Human Resources and Skils Development, Minister's office |
June 2005 to January 2006 | Not a designated office |
Chief of Staff
Labour, Housing and Homlessness, Minister's office |
June 2004 to June 2005 | Not a designated office |
Chief of Staff
Canada Revenue Agency and Amateur Sports, Minister's office |
December 2003 to June 2004 | Not a designated office |
Chief of Staff
Canada Customs and Revenue Agency, Minister's office |
September 2002 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Manager
Department of Human Resources and Skils Development, Financial Sector Communications |
November 2001 to September 2002 | Not a designated office |
Chief of Staff
Canadian International Development Agency, Minister's office |
August 1999 to February 2001 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Department of Finance, Minister's office |
September 1998 to August 1999 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Department of Human Resources and Skils Development, Minister's office |
October 1996 to September 1998 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Canadian International Development Agency, Minister's office |
April 1996 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Tony Valeri, MP |
February 1994 to April 1996 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy and Program Leader
CFIA, Domestic Food Safety Systems |
April 2017 to November 2017 | Not a designated office |
Subject Matter Officer
Statistics Canada, Livestock Division |
April 2010 to August 2011 | Not a designated office |
Meat Inspector
CFIA, Ontario Operations |
November 2008 to April 2010 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Trade Policy Officer
Agriculture Canada, Market and Industry Services Branch |
August 2016 to August 2017 | Not a designated office |
Trade Commisioner/Agri-Food Councillor
Agriculture Canada, Canadian Embassy, Mexico |
August 2011 to July 2016 | Not a designated office |
Trade Commisioner/Agri-Food Consul
Agriculture Canada, Canadian Consulate General, Denver, CO, USA |
August 2006 to August 2011 | Not a designated office |
Special Advisor, Trade Advocacy
Agriculture Canada, Market and Industry Services Branch |
August 2004 to August 2006 | Not a designated office |
Trade Commisioner/Agri-Food Councillor
Foreign Affairs/International Trade, Canadian Embassy, Mexico |
August 1999 to August 2004 | Not a designated office |
Mexico Desk Officer, Agri-Food
Foreign Affairs/International Trade, Canadian Embassy, Mexico |
August 1996 to August 1999 | Not a designated office |
Market Development Officer
Agriculture Canada, Market and Industry Services Branch |
1993 to August 1996 | Not a designated office |
Special/Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Hon. Bill McKnight, PC, MP |
1990 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
House of Commons, Murray Cardiff, MP |
1984 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
Assistant to Chief of Staff
House of Commons, Hon. Paul Cosgrove, PC, MP |
1983 to 1984 | Not a designated office |
Member's Assistant
House of Commons, Doug Frith, MP |
1980 to 1983 | Not a designated office |
Member's Assistant
House of Commons, Hon. Jim Jerome, MP (Speaker) |
1975 to 1980 | Not a designated office |