At Enbridge, we safely connect millions of people to the energy they rely on every day, fueling quality of life through our North American natural gas, oil or renewable power networks and our growing European offshore wind portfolio. Enbridge Gas, a subsidiary of Enbridge Inc., is Canada’s largest natural gas storage, transmission and distribution company based in Ontario, with more than 175 years of service to customers. The distribution business provides safe, affordable, reliable energy to about 3.9 million homes, businesses and industries and is leading the transition to a clean energy future through net zero emissions targets and investments in innovative low-carbon energy solutions. With the recent acquisition of three gas utilities serving customers in five US states, Enbridge Gas will become the largest gas utility franchise in North America. We’re investing in modern energy delivery infrastructure to sustain access to secure, affordable energy and building on two decades of experience in renewable energy to advance new technologies including wind and solar power, hydrogen, renewable natural gas and carbon capture and storage. We’re committed to reducing the carbon footprint of the energy we deliver, and to achieving net zero greenhouse gas emissions by 2050. Headquartered in Calgary, Alberta, Enbridge’s common shares trade under the symbol ENB on the Toronto (TSX) and New York (NYSE) stock exchanges. To learn more, visit us at Enbridge.com.
Greg Ebel, President and Chief Executive Officer
End date of the last completed financial year: 2023-12-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Alberta Innovates | $500,000.00 | Yes |
Ministère des Ressources Naturelles et des Forêts (Québec) | $70,000.00 | Yes |
Natural Resources Canada (NRCan) | $125,818,399.00 | Yes |
Ontario Ministry of Energy | $19,559,784.60 | Yes |
Address:
Suite 3000
425, 1st Street SW
Calgary, AB T2P 3L8
Canada
Telephone number:
713-627-5400
Enbridge Inc. is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Enbridge Inc. | 2024-03-15 | current |
Enbridge Inc. | 2008-07-23 | 2024-03-15 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Greg Ebel | 2023-01-01 | Current |
Al Monaco | 2012-10-01 | 2023-01-01 |
Patrick Daniel | 2005-07-25 | 2012-10-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Advisor, Policy & Stakeholder Relations
Ministry of State (Science & Technology), Office of the Minister of State (Science & Technology) |
March 2014 to December 2015 | December 4, 2015 |
Policy Advisor
The Ministry of State (Science & Technology) and (FedNor), Office of the Minister of State (Science & Technology) and (FedNor) |
July 2013 to March 2014 | March 18, 2014 |
Special Assistant, Policy
The Ministry of State (Science & Technology) and (FedDev), Office of the Minister of State (Science & Technology) and (FedDev) |
June 2011 to July 2013 | July 14, 2013 |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant to the Honourable Colin Kenny, Senator
Senate of Canada, Office of Senator Colin Kenny |
February 2009 to July 2011 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief of Staff
Minister of Finance and Deputy Prime Minister of Canada, Minister's office |
January 1990 to December 1993 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant and Policy Advisor
Office of the Minister of State for Privatization and Regulatory Affairs, Minister of State |
January 1988 to December 1990 | Not a designated office |