FOUNDED IN 1971, CFIB IS A NON-PROFIT, NON-PARTISAN BUSINESS ORGANIZATION WHICH EXISTS TO PROMOTE & PROTECT A SYSTEM OF FREE COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE, TO STRENGTHEN THE ENTREPRENEURIAL CULTURE IN CANADA AND TO GIVE INDEPENDENT BUSINESS A GREATER VOICE IN DETERMINING THE LAWS THAT GOVERN BUSINESS AND THE NATION. IT IS THE LARGEST ORGANIZATION EXCLUSIVELY REPRESENTING THE SMALL- AND MEDIUM-SIZED BUSINESS COMMUNITY ACROSS CANADA. THE FEDERATION IS UNIQUE AS A POLITICAL ACTION ORGANIZATION BECAUSE IT IS THE MEMBERSHIP THAT SETS THE ORGANIZATION'S POLICIES & PRIORITIES BY REFERENDUM & CENSUS. IT IS FOUNDED ON THE PRINCIPLE OF ONE MEMBER- ONE VOTE. ANALYSIS OF THE VOTE RESULTS AND THE IMPLICATIONS LEAD TO A FORMAL CFIB POSITION ON AN ISSUE.
Daniel Kelly, PRESIDENT and CHIEF EXECUTIVE OFFICER
Address:
401 - 4141 YONGE STREET
TORONTO, ON M2P 2A6
Canada
Telephone number:
613-235-2373
Fax number:
613-235-4137
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Canadian Federation of Independent Business (CFIB)/Fédération canadienne de l’entreprise indépendante (FCEI) | 2024-04-15 | current |
Canadian Federation of Independent Business (CFIB)/Fédération canadienne de l’entreprise indépendante (FCEI) | 2008-08-11 | 2024-04-15 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Daniel Kelly | 2012-06-08 | Current |
CATHERINE SWIFT | 1997-07-31 | 2012-06-08 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Advisor, Federal/Provincial Relations
Department of Supply & Services Canada, Regina, Saskatchewan |
November 1989 to June 1990 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Media Relations, Communications
Senator Bob Runciman - Small contract, n/a |
2010 to 2010 | Not a designated office |
Intern under the Student Political Apprenticeship Pro
Regional Industrial Expansion, n/a |
1980 to 1980 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student Statistics Canada
Statistics Canada, n/a |
1980 to 1980 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Research Assistant
Aboriginal Affairs and Northern Development Canada, Litigation Management and Resolution Branch |
January 2012 to April 2012 | Not a designated office |
Research Assistant - Co-op
Indian and Northern Affairs Canada, Litigation Management and Resolution Branch |
January 2010 to December 2011 | Not a designated office |
Assistant Planning Officer - Co-op
Ministry of the Environment, Strategic Planning and Coordination Division |
May 2009 to September 2009 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Constituency Assistant
MP Joan Crockatt, Calgary Centre |
February 2014 to January 2015 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
MP Andrew Scheer, House of Commons |
August 2008 to October 2009 | Not a designated office |
Intern
Prime Ministers Office, Strategic Planning |
May 2007 to September 2007 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant
Aboriginal Affairs and Nothern Dev. Canada, Minister Office |
November 2013 to August 2014 | August 1, 2014 |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Assistant to the Honourable Keith Ashfield MP
House of Commons, Fisheries |
May 2011 to November 2015 | Not a designated office |
Summer Administratvive Student position
Atlantic Canada Opportunities Agency, Member of Parliaments office, Keith Ashfield |
June 2010 to September 2010 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Business Development Director
Canadian International Development Agency contract, Almaty, Kazahstan, Asia |
October 1999 to May 2000 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Parliamentary Affairs
Office of the Minister, Human Resources and Skills Development Canada |
September 2009 to April 2010 | April 30, 2010 |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Research and Coordination Officer
Health Canada, Health Canada |
July 2005 to December 2008 | Not a designated office |
Media Monitoring Assistant
Health Canada, Health Canada |
June 2004 to November 2004 | Not a designated office |
Researcher
Export Development Canada, Export Development Canada |
September 2003 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Communications Coordination and Liaison Officer
Fisheries and Oceans, Fisheries and Oceans |
May 2003 to August 2003 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Administrative and Research officer
Veteran's Affairs, Student work program |
June 1999 to October 1999 | Not a designated office |
Database Clerk
Veteran's Affairs, Student Work program |
June 1999 to October 1999 | Not a designated office |