Mission Statement - the mission of the Canadian Home Builders' Association is to be the voice of the residential construction industry in Canada, to achieve an environment in which our membership can operate profitably and to promote affordability and choice in housing for all Canadians
JOHN KENWARD, CHIEF OPERATING OFFICER
End date of the last completed financial year: 2011-10-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Natural Resources Canada (NRCan) | $115,000.00 | Yes |
Address:
Suite 500
150 Laurier Avenue West
Ottawa, ON K1P 5J4
Canada
Telephone number:
613-230-3060
Ext.
222
Fax number:
613-232-8214
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Canadian Home Builders' Association | 2024-07-17 | current |
Canadian Home Builders' Association | 2009-01-26 | 2024-07-17 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Kevin Lee | 2013-06-01 | Current |
JOHN KENWARD | 1996-02-06 | 2013-06-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Social Policy Advisor
Office of the Prime Minister of Canada, Policy |
September 1981 to June 1984 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Social Policy Advisor
Office of the Prime Minister of Canada, Policy |
September 1981 to June 1984 | Not a designated office |