SNC-Lavalin is one of the leading groups of engineering and construction companies in the world, and a global leader in the ownership and management of infrastructure. Founded in 1911, SNC-Lavalin is acknowledged for its world class technical expertise, project and construction management and procurement and financial arrangement services - all delivered locally to clients anywhere in the world through its extensive international network of offices, partners and suppliers.
Robert Card, President and Chief Executive Officer
End date of the last completed financial year: 2011-12-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Foreign Affairs and International Trade Canada (DFAITC) | $67,157.00 | Yes |
Address:
170 Laurier Ave, West, Suite 1100
Ottawa, ON K1P 5V5
Canada
Telephone number:
514-393-1000
SNC-Lavalin Inc. is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
AtkinsRéalis/ | 2024-04-30 | current |
AtkinsRéalis/ | 2023-09-19 | 2024-04-30 |
SNC-Lavalin Inc. | 2008-08-13 | 2023-09-19 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Ian Edwards | 2019-07-11 | Current |
Neil Bruce | 2015-10-05 | 2019-07-11 |
Robert Card | 2012-10-01 | 2015-10-05 |
Ian A. Bourne | 2012-03-26 | 2012-10-01 |
Pierre Duhaime | 2009-05-07 | 2012-03-26 |
Jacques Lamarre | 2005-08-10 | 2009-05-07 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
ADM Policy
Department of Citizenship and Immigration, Policy Branch |
September 2003 to December 2005 | Not a designated office |
ADM Policy
Dept of Industry, Science and Technology, Policy Sector |
August 1997 to August 2003 | Not a designated office |
Assistant Secretary Priorities and Planning
Privy Council Office, Priorities and Planning Secretariat |
March 1983 to September 1987 | Not a designated office |
Director General Energy Strategy then Deputy Administrator Canadian Oil and Gas Lands
Department of Energy Mines and Resources, Policy Branch |
February 1981 to March 1983 | Not a designated office |
Foreign Service Officer
Department of External Affairs, various |
June 1966 to February 1981 | Not a designated office |